JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 6

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 6

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 6, 2020.

Questions

1) 1233 x 506=
2) 5848 x 909=
3) 1769 x 358=
4) 1079 x 125=
5) 8178 x 325=
6) 7946 x 533=
7) 4700 x 243=
8) 3391 x 556=
9) 6971 x 172=
10) 7687 x 598=
11) 4211 x 620=
12) 5546 x 203=
13) 6617 x 810=
14) 8410 x 376=
15) 1182 x 638=
16) 1994 x 499=
17) 8359 x 888=
18) 7748 x 551=
19) 9782 x 464=
20) 8266 x 887=
21) 6518 x 156=
22) 1387 x 878=
23) 5218 x 698=
24) 1790 x 691=
25) 2123 x 689=
26) 7752 x 349=
27) 7985 x 701=
28) 4676 x 788=
29) 4491 x 117=
30) 7362 x 215=
31) 3869 x 810=
32) 7347 x 515=
33) 7825 x 823=
34) 3998 x 920=
35) 1034 x 415=
36) 3785 x 220=
37) 8008 x 627=
38) 8658 x 648=
39) 1393 x 744=
40) 3567 x 829=
41) 9521 x 978=
42) 4666 x 682=
43) 5813 x 437=
44) 8905 x 358=
45) 1379 x 906=
46) 4830 x 512=
47) 9643 x 163=
48) 8361 x 592=
49) 8114 x 733=
50) 1425 x 380=




Answers

1) 1233 * 506 = 623898 2) 5848 * 909 = 5315832 3) 1769 * 358 = 633302 4) 1079 * 125 = 134875 5) 8178 * 325 = 2657850 6) 7946 * 533 = 4235218 7) 4700 * 243 = 1142100 8) 3391 * 556 = 1885396 9) 6971 * 172 = 1199012 10) 7687 * 598 = 4596826 11) 4211 * 620 = 2610820 12) 5546 * 203 = 1125838 13) 6617 * 810 = 5359770 14) 8410 * 376 = 3162160 15) 1182 * 638 = 754116 16) 1994 * 499 = 995006 17) 8359 * 888 = 7422792 18) 7748 * 551 = 4269148 19) 9782 * 464 = 4538848 20) 8266 * 887 = 7331942 21) 6518 * 156 = 1016808 22) 1387 * 878 = 1217786 23) 5218 * 698 = 3642164 24) 1790 * 691 = 1236890 25) 2123 * 689 = 1462747 26) 7752 * 349 = 2705448 27) 7985 * 701 = 5597485 28) 4676 * 788 = 3684688 29) 4491 * 117 = 525447 30) 7362 * 215 = 1582830 31) 3869 * 810 = 3133890 32) 7347 * 515 = 3783705 33) 7825 * 823 = 6439975 34) 3998 * 920 = 3678160 35) 1034 * 415 = 429110 36) 3785 * 220 = 832700 37) 8008 * 627 = 5021016 38) 8658 * 648 = 5610384 39) 1393 * 744 = 1036392 40) 3567 * 829 = 2957043 41) 9521 * 978 = 9311538 42) 4666 * 682 = 3182212 43) 5813 * 437 = 2540281 44) 8905 * 358 = 3187990 45) 1379 * 906 = 1249374 46) 4830 * 512 = 2472960 47) 9643 * 163 = 1571809 48) 8361 * 592 = 4949712 49) 8114 * 733 = 5947562 50) 1425 * 380 = 541500

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 6

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 6

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets