1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 61

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 61

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 31, 2020.

Questions

1) 6323 x 447=
2) 1259 x 148=
3) 6660 x 457=
4) 3179 x 623=
5) 8044 x 802=
6) 9995 x 867=
7) 1325 x 472=
8) 3793 x 578=
9) 5328 x 399=
10) 4284 x 313=
11) 4602 x 190=
12) 6615 x 928=
13) 4948 x 499=
14) 5006 x 785=
15) 3761 x 309=
16) 7392 x 827=
17) 8947 x 112=
18) 8590 x 767=
19) 1957 x 824=
20) 8544 x 571=
21) 7017 x 602=
22) 3028 x 774=
23) 7329 x 943=
24) 6057 x 447=
25) 8745 x 783=
26) 3749 x 206=
27) 8264 x 665=
28) 3345 x 757=
29) 3753 x 510=
30) 3111 x 602=
31) 4741 x 173=
32) 7644 x 809=
33) 3640 x 616=
34) 5217 x 768=
35) 4925 x 679=
36) 1816 x 944=
37) 9533 x 382=
38) 4129 x 233=
39) 2246 x 765=
40) 6309 x 348=
41) 4752 x 649=
42) 7264 x 476=
43) 1773 x 312=
44) 1940 x 560=
45) 9402 x 187=
46) 5133 x 657=
47) 7865 x 237=
48) 1367 x 450=
49) 6912 x 209=
50) 9048 x 984=




Answers

1) 6323 * 447 = 2826381 2) 1259 * 148 = 186332 3) 6660 * 457 = 3043620 4) 3179 * 623 = 1980517 5) 8044 * 802 = 6451288 6) 9995 * 867 = 8665665 7) 1325 * 472 = 625400 8) 3793 * 578 = 2192354 9) 5328 * 399 = 2125872 10) 4284 * 313 = 1340892 11) 4602 * 190 = 874380 12) 6615 * 928 = 6138720 13) 4948 * 499 = 2469052 14) 5006 * 785 = 3929710 15) 3761 * 309 = 1162149 16) 7392 * 827 = 6113184 17) 8947 * 112 = 1002064 18) 8590 * 767 = 6588530 19) 1957 * 824 = 1612568 20) 8544 * 571 = 4878624 21) 7017 * 602 = 4224234 22) 3028 * 774 = 2343672 23) 7329 * 943 = 6911247 24) 6057 * 447 = 2707479 25) 8745 * 783 = 6847335 26) 3749 * 206 = 772294 27) 8264 * 665 = 5495560 28) 3345 * 757 = 2532165 29) 3753 * 510 = 1914030 30) 3111 * 602 = 1872822 31) 4741 * 173 = 820193 32) 7644 * 809 = 6183996 33) 3640 * 616 = 2242240 34) 5217 * 768 = 4006656 35) 4925 * 679 = 3344075 36) 1816 * 944 = 1714304 37) 9533 * 382 = 3641606 38) 4129 * 233 = 962057 39) 2246 * 765 = 1718190 40) 6309 * 348 = 2195532 41) 4752 * 649 = 3084048 42) 7264 * 476 = 3457664 43) 1773 * 312 = 553176 44) 1940 * 560 = 1086400 45) 9402 * 187 = 1758174 46) 5133 * 657 = 3372381 47) 7865 * 237 = 1864005 48) 1367 * 450 = 615150 49) 6912 * 209 = 1444608 50) 9048 * 984 = 8903232

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 61

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 61

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets