1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 62

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 62

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on November 1, 2020.

Questions

1) 7452 x 346=
2) 4312 x 405=
3) 1452 x 188=
4) 9355 x 703=
5) 9885 x 757=
6) 7179 x 731=
7) 1185 x 534=
8) 5896 x 994=
9) 7534 x 997=
10) 6292 x 801=
11) 8278 x 264=
12) 4274 x 999=
13) 6021 x 481=
14) 5502 x 717=
15) 8366 x 570=
16) 5142 x 769=
17) 4757 x 755=
18) 6100 x 600=
19) 5691 x 137=
20) 6986 x 919=
21) 1780 x 370=
22) 5562 x 640=
23) 4927 x 995=
24) 8679 x 242=
25) 4251 x 116=
26) 6160 x 488=
27) 5610 x 989=
28) 7970 x 749=
29) 9057 x 694=
30) 8534 x 245=
31) 9849 x 771=
32) 4076 x 695=
33) 9375 x 442=
34) 8400 x 776=
35) 4092 x 804=
36) 8307 x 382=
37) 2568 x 152=
38) 6209 x 113=
39) 1851 x 995=
40) 3220 x 135=
41) 8155 x 949=
42) 7375 x 717=
43) 7198 x 175=
44) 6773 x 544=
45) 1091 x 696=
46) 9557 x 727=
47) 7436 x 884=
48) 9901 x 899=
49) 6395 x 165=
50) 1826 x 396=




Answers

1) 7452 * 346 = 2578392 2) 4312 * 405 = 1746360 3) 1452 * 188 = 272976 4) 9355 * 703 = 6576565 5) 9885 * 757 = 7482945 6) 7179 * 731 = 5247849 7) 1185 * 534 = 632790 8) 5896 * 994 = 5860624 9) 7534 * 997 = 7511398 10) 6292 * 801 = 5039892 11) 8278 * 264 = 2185392 12) 4274 * 999 = 4269726 13) 6021 * 481 = 2896101 14) 5502 * 717 = 3944934 15) 8366 * 570 = 4768620 16) 5142 * 769 = 3954198 17) 4757 * 755 = 3591535 18) 6100 * 600 = 3660000 19) 5691 * 137 = 779667 20) 6986 * 919 = 6420134 21) 1780 * 370 = 658600 22) 5562 * 640 = 3559680 23) 4927 * 995 = 4902365 24) 8679 * 242 = 2100318 25) 4251 * 116 = 493116 26) 6160 * 488 = 3006080 27) 5610 * 989 = 5548290 28) 7970 * 749 = 5969530 29) 9057 * 694 = 6285558 30) 8534 * 245 = 2090830 31) 9849 * 771 = 7593579 32) 4076 * 695 = 2832820 33) 9375 * 442 = 4143750 34) 8400 * 776 = 6518400 35) 4092 * 804 = 3289968 36) 8307 * 382 = 3173274 37) 2568 * 152 = 390336 38) 6209 * 113 = 701617 39) 1851 * 995 = 1841745 40) 3220 * 135 = 434700 41) 8155 * 949 = 7739095 42) 7375 * 717 = 5287875 43) 7198 * 175 = 1259650 44) 6773 * 544 = 3684512 45) 1091 * 696 = 759336 46) 9557 * 727 = 6947939 47) 7436 * 884 = 6573424 48) 9901 * 899 = 8900999 49) 6395 * 165 = 1055175 50) 1826 * 396 = 723096

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 62

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 62

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets