1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 63

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 63

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on November 2, 2020.

Questions

1) 3925 x 536=
2) 2770 x 267=
3) 8432 x 303=
4) 2366 x 915=
5) 9120 x 402=
6) 6543 x 926=
7) 4501 x 795=
8) 9308 x 703=
9) 3756 x 290=
10) 7017 x 782=
11) 4729 x 421=
12) 6846 x 441=
13) 3438 x 748=
14) 7849 x 470=
15) 2090 x 112=
16) 3073 x 458=
17) 1914 x 702=
18) 5684 x 694=
19) 9553 x 678=
20) 9870 x 145=
21) 3164 x 976=
22) 3625 x 326=
23) 5424 x 849=
24) 1394 x 809=
25) 9689 x 732=
26) 4266 x 713=
27) 7722 x 329=
28) 5353 x 856=
29) 4707 x 931=
30) 3324 x 902=
31) 8003 x 953=
32) 3660 x 405=
33) 9106 x 974=
34) 1678 x 829=
35) 5517 x 636=
36) 5807 x 884=
37) 3673 x 840=
38) 5406 x 320=
39) 7534 x 905=
40) 7537 x 100=
41) 4500 x 866=
42) 2050 x 635=
43) 8525 x 665=
44) 2837 x 316=
45) 1719 x 639=
46) 6777 x 847=
47) 8675 x 878=
48) 3621 x 848=
49) 2130 x 524=
50) 1891 x 767=




Answers

1) 3925 * 536 = 2103800 2) 2770 * 267 = 739590 3) 8432 * 303 = 2554896 4) 2366 * 915 = 2164890 5) 9120 * 402 = 3666240 6) 6543 * 926 = 6058818 7) 4501 * 795 = 3578295 8) 9308 * 703 = 6543524 9) 3756 * 290 = 1089240 10) 7017 * 782 = 5487294 11) 4729 * 421 = 1990909 12) 6846 * 441 = 3019086 13) 3438 * 748 = 2571624 14) 7849 * 470 = 3689030 15) 2090 * 112 = 234080 16) 3073 * 458 = 1407434 17) 1914 * 702 = 1343628 18) 5684 * 694 = 3944696 19) 9553 * 678 = 6476934 20) 9870 * 145 = 1431150 21) 3164 * 976 = 3088064 22) 3625 * 326 = 1181750 23) 5424 * 849 = 4604976 24) 1394 * 809 = 1127746 25) 9689 * 732 = 7092348 26) 4266 * 713 = 3041658 27) 7722 * 329 = 2540538 28) 5353 * 856 = 4582168 29) 4707 * 931 = 4382217 30) 3324 * 902 = 2998248 31) 8003 * 953 = 7626859 32) 3660 * 405 = 1482300 33) 9106 * 974 = 8869244 34) 1678 * 829 = 1391062 35) 5517 * 636 = 3508812 36) 5807 * 884 = 5133388 37) 3673 * 840 = 3085320 38) 5406 * 320 = 1729920 39) 7534 * 905 = 6818270 40) 7537 * 100 = 753700 41) 4500 * 866 = 3897000 42) 2050 * 635 = 1301750 43) 8525 * 665 = 5669125 44) 2837 * 316 = 896492 45) 1719 * 639 = 1098441 46) 6777 * 847 = 5740119 47) 8675 * 878 = 7616650 48) 3621 * 848 = 3070608 49) 2130 * 524 = 1116120 50) 1891 * 767 = 1450397

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 63

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 63

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets