1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 64

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 64

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 7836 x 732=
2) 8050 x 761=
3) 9853 x 749=
4) 7917 x 363=
5) 2969 x 952=
6) 3056 x 211=
7) 8613 x 778=
8) 2679 x 591=
9) 7923 x 459=
10) 8544 x 518=
11) 4404 x 502=
12) 6963 x 192=
13) 4208 x 612=
14) 7179 x 939=
15) 7482 x 777=
16) 5664 x 591=
17) 1681 x 219=
18) 9350 x 803=
19) 9770 x 883=
20) 9662 x 578=
21) 1691 x 173=
22) 9357 x 689=
23) 9882 x 727=
24) 6716 x 424=
25) 5042 x 337=
26) 2160 x 306=
27) 1993 x 574=
28) 3103 x 486=
29) 9805 x 567=
30) 2157 x 313=
31) 3399 x 907=
32) 4702 x 561=
33) 9180 x 130=
34) 6644 x 268=
35) 4354 x 613=
36) 3214 x 773=
37) 7574 x 589=
38) 6616 x 209=
39) 5310 x 508=
40) 1639 x 363=
41) 5984 x 616=
42) 2768 x 122=
43) 2044 x 198=
44) 5187 x 783=
45) 7083 x 104=
46) 2864 x 135=
47) 7944 x 807=
48) 4347 x 487=
49) 8340 x 209=
50) 1920 x 554=




Answers

1) 7836 * 732 = 5735952 2) 8050 * 761 = 6126050 3) 9853 * 749 = 7379897 4) 7917 * 363 = 2873871 5) 2969 * 952 = 2826488 6) 3056 * 211 = 644816 7) 8613 * 778 = 6700914 8) 2679 * 591 = 1583289 9) 7923 * 459 = 3636657 10) 8544 * 518 = 4425792 11) 4404 * 502 = 2210808 12) 6963 * 192 = 1336896 13) 4208 * 612 = 2575296 14) 7179 * 939 = 6741081 15) 7482 * 777 = 5813514 16) 5664 * 591 = 3347424 17) 1681 * 219 = 368139 18) 9350 * 803 = 7508050 19) 9770 * 883 = 8626910 20) 9662 * 578 = 5584636 21) 1691 * 173 = 292543 22) 9357 * 689 = 6446973 23) 9882 * 727 = 7184214 24) 6716 * 424 = 2847584 25) 5042 * 337 = 1699154 26) 2160 * 306 = 660960 27) 1993 * 574 = 1143982 28) 3103 * 486 = 1508058 29) 9805 * 567 = 5559435 30) 2157 * 313 = 675141 31) 3399 * 907 = 3082893 32) 4702 * 561 = 2637822 33) 9180 * 130 = 1193400 34) 6644 * 268 = 1780592 35) 4354 * 613 = 2669002 36) 3214 * 773 = 2484422 37) 7574 * 589 = 4461086 38) 6616 * 209 = 1382744 39) 5310 * 508 = 2697480 40) 1639 * 363 = 594957 41) 5984 * 616 = 3686144 42) 2768 * 122 = 337696 43) 2044 * 198 = 404712 44) 5187 * 783 = 4061421 45) 7083 * 104 = 736632 46) 2864 * 135 = 386640 47) 7944 * 807 = 6410808 48) 4347 * 487 = 2116989 49) 8340 * 209 = 1743060 50) 1920 * 554 = 1063680

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 64

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 64

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets