1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 65

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 65

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on November 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 6525 x 658=
2) 3309 x 946=
3) 7251 x 691=
4) 8185 x 410=
5) 6498 x 222=
6) 6955 x 824=
7) 1739 x 524=
8) 2005 x 779=
9) 6303 x 648=
10) 6163 x 832=
11) 5884 x 841=
12) 2326 x 714=
13) 6801 x 783=
14) 8742 x 485=
15) 8359 x 305=
16) 2270 x 878=
17) 1796 x 980=
18) 9300 x 356=
19) 1680 x 394=
20) 5540 x 673=
21) 2118 x 155=
22) 5758 x 890=
23) 3251 x 272=
24) 7226 x 531=
25) 9318 x 114=
26) 2223 x 177=
27) 3143 x 526=
28) 8885 x 949=
29) 4528 x 276=
30) 6148 x 382=
31) 7695 x 515=
32) 7285 x 849=
33) 3398 x 158=
34) 1661 x 874=
35) 9616 x 945=
36) 4912 x 575=
37) 4239 x 348=
38) 3055 x 414=
39) 5184 x 168=
40) 4383 x 564=
41) 9744 x 731=
42) 6250 x 956=
43) 5994 x 507=
44) 7896 x 109=
45) 6000 x 378=
46) 2158 x 614=
47) 5423 x 923=
48) 1356 x 435=
49) 1850 x 858=
50) 7099 x 688=




Answers

1) 6525 * 658 = 4293450 2) 3309 * 946 = 3130314 3) 7251 * 691 = 5010441 4) 8185 * 410 = 3355850 5) 6498 * 222 = 1442556 6) 6955 * 824 = 5730920 7) 1739 * 524 = 911236 8) 2005 * 779 = 1561895 9) 6303 * 648 = 4084344 10) 6163 * 832 = 5127616 11) 5884 * 841 = 4948444 12) 2326 * 714 = 1660764 13) 6801 * 783 = 5325183 14) 8742 * 485 = 4239870 15) 8359 * 305 = 2549495 16) 2270 * 878 = 1993060 17) 1796 * 980 = 1760080 18) 9300 * 356 = 3310800 19) 1680 * 394 = 661920 20) 5540 * 673 = 3728420 21) 2118 * 155 = 328290 22) 5758 * 890 = 5124620 23) 3251 * 272 = 884272 24) 7226 * 531 = 3837006 25) 9318 * 114 = 1062252 26) 2223 * 177 = 393471 27) 3143 * 526 = 1653218 28) 8885 * 949 = 8431865 29) 4528 * 276 = 1249728 30) 6148 * 382 = 2348536 31) 7695 * 515 = 3962925 32) 7285 * 849 = 6184965 33) 3398 * 158 = 536884 34) 1661 * 874 = 1451714 35) 9616 * 945 = 9087120 36) 4912 * 575 = 2824400 37) 4239 * 348 = 1475172 38) 3055 * 414 = 1264770 39) 5184 * 168 = 870912 40) 4383 * 564 = 2472012 41) 9744 * 731 = 7122864 42) 6250 * 956 = 5975000 43) 5994 * 507 = 3038958 44) 7896 * 109 = 860664 45) 6000 * 378 = 2268000 46) 2158 * 614 = 1325012 47) 5423 * 923 = 5005429 48) 1356 * 435 = 589860 49) 1850 * 858 = 1587300 50) 7099 * 688 = 4884112

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 65

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 65

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets