1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 66

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 66

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 5, 2020.

Questions

1) 3379 x 459=
2) 6485 x 525=
3) 5280 x 940=
4) 1847 x 360=
5) 8827 x 860=
6) 6909 x 138=
7) 9946 x 380=
8) 7743 x 428=
9) 3754 x 864=
10) 7128 x 215=
11) 5399 x 742=
12) 2341 x 798=
13) 7008 x 966=
14) 4712 x 755=
15) 7045 x 344=
16) 6802 x 976=
17) 9460 x 624=
18) 4832 x 471=
19) 4666 x 693=
20) 4838 x 847=
21) 6320 x 375=
22) 4374 x 520=
23) 2159 x 501=
24) 9244 x 384=
25) 7751 x 847=
26) 2511 x 630=
27) 6152 x 134=
28) 2769 x 781=
29) 3790 x 939=
30) 7998 x 984=
31) 1075 x 423=
32) 5440 x 277=
33) 5455 x 569=
34) 5210 x 966=
35) 1897 x 950=
36) 3871 x 579=
37) 2079 x 497=
38) 5934 x 804=
39) 1766 x 177=
40) 6465 x 138=
41) 1022 x 272=
42) 5013 x 711=
43) 2045 x 711=
44) 2389 x 290=
45) 2332 x 635=
46) 3699 x 907=
47) 7853 x 296=
48) 8027 x 691=
49) 9118 x 868=
50) 7727 x 294=




Answers

1) 3379 * 459 = 1550961 2) 6485 * 525 = 3404625 3) 5280 * 940 = 4963200 4) 1847 * 360 = 664920 5) 8827 * 860 = 7591220 6) 6909 * 138 = 953442 7) 9946 * 380 = 3779480 8) 7743 * 428 = 3314004 9) 3754 * 864 = 3243456 10) 7128 * 215 = 1532520 11) 5399 * 742 = 4006058 12) 2341 * 798 = 1868118 13) 7008 * 966 = 6769728 14) 4712 * 755 = 3557560 15) 7045 * 344 = 2423480 16) 6802 * 976 = 6638752 17) 9460 * 624 = 5903040 18) 4832 * 471 = 2275872 19) 4666 * 693 = 3233538 20) 4838 * 847 = 4097786 21) 6320 * 375 = 2370000 22) 4374 * 520 = 2274480 23) 2159 * 501 = 1081659 24) 9244 * 384 = 3549696 25) 7751 * 847 = 6565097 26) 2511 * 630 = 1581930 27) 6152 * 134 = 824368 28) 2769 * 781 = 2162589 29) 3790 * 939 = 3558810 30) 7998 * 984 = 7870032 31) 1075 * 423 = 454725 32) 5440 * 277 = 1506880 33) 5455 * 569 = 3103895 34) 5210 * 966 = 5032860 35) 1897 * 950 = 1802150 36) 3871 * 579 = 2241309 37) 2079 * 497 = 1033263 38) 5934 * 804 = 4770936 39) 1766 * 177 = 312582 40) 6465 * 138 = 892170 41) 1022 * 272 = 277984 42) 5013 * 711 = 3564243 43) 2045 * 711 = 1453995 44) 2389 * 290 = 692810 45) 2332 * 635 = 1480820 46) 3699 * 907 = 3354993 47) 7853 * 296 = 2324488 48) 8027 * 691 = 5546657 49) 9118 * 868 = 7914424 50) 7727 * 294 = 2271738

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 66

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 66

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets