1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 67

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 67

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on November 6, 2020.

Questions

1) 2051 x 319=
2) 2061 x 433=
3) 5303 x 906=
4) 7813 x 634=
5) 6159 x 912=
6) 1447 x 291=
7) 5779 x 153=
8) 4951 x 638=
9) 7359 x 636=
10) 8695 x 401=
11) 1451 x 359=
12) 6628 x 322=
13) 8638 x 535=
14) 1105 x 147=
15) 9466 x 502=
16) 4343 x 223=
17) 2038 x 930=
18) 2937 x 419=
19) 2022 x 311=
20) 6334 x 569=
21) 8106 x 577=
22) 2473 x 516=
23) 1102 x 783=
24) 7803 x 511=
25) 1063 x 627=
26) 4920 x 477=
27) 5541 x 915=
28) 4125 x 997=
29) 4408 x 700=
30) 8341 x 342=
31) 2044 x 514=
32) 7414 x 488=
33) 3042 x 292=
34) 8770 x 650=
35) 2358 x 725=
36) 1695 x 564=
37) 6964 x 613=
38) 5294 x 593=
39) 2097 x 280=
40) 2847 x 118=
41) 7569 x 383=
42) 4815 x 858=
43) 1544 x 532=
44) 7289 x 599=
45) 3764 x 618=
46) 2788 x 659=
47) 2459 x 246=
48) 1792 x 369=
49) 5990 x 332=
50) 1067 x 965=




Answers

1) 2051 * 319 = 654269 2) 2061 * 433 = 892413 3) 5303 * 906 = 4804518 4) 7813 * 634 = 4953442 5) 6159 * 912 = 5617008 6) 1447 * 291 = 421077 7) 5779 * 153 = 884187 8) 4951 * 638 = 3158738 9) 7359 * 636 = 4680324 10) 8695 * 401 = 3486695 11) 1451 * 359 = 520909 12) 6628 * 322 = 2134216 13) 8638 * 535 = 4621330 14) 1105 * 147 = 162435 15) 9466 * 502 = 4751932 16) 4343 * 223 = 968489 17) 2038 * 930 = 1895340 18) 2937 * 419 = 1230603 19) 2022 * 311 = 628842 20) 6334 * 569 = 3604046 21) 8106 * 577 = 4677162 22) 2473 * 516 = 1276068 23) 1102 * 783 = 862866 24) 7803 * 511 = 3987333 25) 1063 * 627 = 666501 26) 4920 * 477 = 2346840 27) 5541 * 915 = 5070015 28) 4125 * 997 = 4112625 29) 4408 * 700 = 3085600 30) 8341 * 342 = 2852622 31) 2044 * 514 = 1050616 32) 7414 * 488 = 3618032 33) 3042 * 292 = 888264 34) 8770 * 650 = 5700500 35) 2358 * 725 = 1709550 36) 1695 * 564 = 955980 37) 6964 * 613 = 4268932 38) 5294 * 593 = 3139342 39) 2097 * 280 = 587160 40) 2847 * 118 = 335946 41) 7569 * 383 = 2898927 42) 4815 * 858 = 4131270 43) 1544 * 532 = 821408 44) 7289 * 599 = 4366111 45) 3764 * 618 = 2326152 46) 2788 * 659 = 1837292 47) 2459 * 246 = 604914 48) 1792 * 369 = 661248 49) 5990 * 332 = 1988680 50) 1067 * 965 = 1029655

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 67

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 67

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets