1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 68

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 68

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on November 7, 2020.

Questions

1) 3137 x 778=
2) 3092 x 277=
3) 5413 x 339=
4) 9929 x 719=
5) 5503 x 501=
6) 9831 x 422=
7) 6812 x 414=
8) 4848 x 264=
9) 8188 x 112=
10) 4035 x 350=
11) 6474 x 784=
12) 5885 x 149=
13) 1902 x 314=
14) 3971 x 418=
15) 2093 x 107=
16) 5572 x 921=
17) 2085 x 664=
18) 1929 x 357=
19) 3748 x 334=
20) 5785 x 376=
21) 2280 x 373=
22) 3800 x 980=
23) 4034 x 481=
24) 5013 x 387=
25) 8352 x 879=
26) 2068 x 251=
27) 1329 x 712=
28) 7688 x 477=
29) 7350 x 610=
30) 4408 x 804=
31) 5698 x 175=
32) 4220 x 584=
33) 6875 x 682=
34) 5435 x 386=
35) 5419 x 708=
36) 3258 x 642=
37) 4071 x 762=
38) 2611 x 638=
39) 5231 x 874=
40) 7326 x 294=
41) 1664 x 507=
42) 5897 x 901=
43) 5768 x 270=
44) 7029 x 106=
45) 2533 x 434=
46) 6957 x 869=
47) 6130 x 187=
48) 3255 x 220=
49) 2764 x 908=
50) 4014 x 586=




Answers

1) 3137 * 778 = 2440586 2) 3092 * 277 = 856484 3) 5413 * 339 = 1835007 4) 9929 * 719 = 7138951 5) 5503 * 501 = 2757003 6) 9831 * 422 = 4148682 7) 6812 * 414 = 2820168 8) 4848 * 264 = 1279872 9) 8188 * 112 = 917056 10) 4035 * 350 = 1412250 11) 6474 * 784 = 5075616 12) 5885 * 149 = 876865 13) 1902 * 314 = 597228 14) 3971 * 418 = 1659878 15) 2093 * 107 = 223951 16) 5572 * 921 = 5131812 17) 2085 * 664 = 1384440 18) 1929 * 357 = 688653 19) 3748 * 334 = 1251832 20) 5785 * 376 = 2175160 21) 2280 * 373 = 850440 22) 3800 * 980 = 3724000 23) 4034 * 481 = 1940354 24) 5013 * 387 = 1940031 25) 8352 * 879 = 7341408 26) 2068 * 251 = 519068 27) 1329 * 712 = 946248 28) 7688 * 477 = 3667176 29) 7350 * 610 = 4483500 30) 4408 * 804 = 3544032 31) 5698 * 175 = 997150 32) 4220 * 584 = 2464480 33) 6875 * 682 = 4688750 34) 5435 * 386 = 2097910 35) 5419 * 708 = 3836652 36) 3258 * 642 = 2091636 37) 4071 * 762 = 3102102 38) 2611 * 638 = 1665818 39) 5231 * 874 = 4571894 40) 7326 * 294 = 2153844 41) 1664 * 507 = 843648 42) 5897 * 901 = 5313197 43) 5768 * 270 = 1557360 44) 7029 * 106 = 745074 45) 2533 * 434 = 1099322 46) 6957 * 869 = 6045633 47) 6130 * 187 = 1146310 48) 3255 * 220 = 716100 49) 2764 * 908 = 2509712 50) 4014 * 586 = 2352204

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 68

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 68

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets