JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 69

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 69

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 2896 x 124=
2) 1805 x 167=
3) 2010 x 817=
4) 8005 x 390=
5) 6260 x 757=
6) 3189 x 878=
7) 5815 x 507=
8) 2668 x 981=
9) 9366 x 247=
10) 7265 x 410=
11) 4626 x 621=
12) 1176 x 631=
13) 4353 x 260=
14) 9571 x 711=
15) 3713 x 887=
16) 7130 x 485=
17) 2636 x 680=
18) 4290 x 989=
19) 3666 x 692=
20) 9324 x 156=
21) 2859 x 865=
22) 5986 x 831=
23) 9955 x 282=
24) 7781 x 808=
25) 4086 x 250=
26) 9645 x 978=
27) 2553 x 833=
28) 6058 x 450=
29) 5178 x 483=
30) 4532 x 284=
31) 6041 x 878=
32) 5666 x 911=
33) 6735 x 920=
34) 1621 x 886=
35) 9580 x 125=
36) 1343 x 506=
37) 5244 x 712=
38) 8236 x 838=
39) 2562 x 918=
40) 7042 x 782=
41) 5268 x 141=
42) 1610 x 160=
43) 4215 x 896=
44) 8895 x 353=
45) 6230 x 948=
46) 3366 x 621=
47) 2439 x 767=
48) 3220 x 807=
49) 5732 x 730=
50) 3984 x 561=




Answers

1) 2896 * 124 = 359104 2) 1805 * 167 = 301435 3) 2010 * 817 = 1642170 4) 8005 * 390 = 3121950 5) 6260 * 757 = 4738820 6) 3189 * 878 = 2799942 7) 5815 * 507 = 2948205 8) 2668 * 981 = 2617308 9) 9366 * 247 = 2313402 10) 7265 * 410 = 2978650 11) 4626 * 621 = 2872746 12) 1176 * 631 = 742056 13) 4353 * 260 = 1131780 14) 9571 * 711 = 6804981 15) 3713 * 887 = 3293431 16) 7130 * 485 = 3458050 17) 2636 * 680 = 1792480 18) 4290 * 989 = 4242810 19) 3666 * 692 = 2536872 20) 9324 * 156 = 1454544 21) 2859 * 865 = 2473035 22) 5986 * 831 = 4974366 23) 9955 * 282 = 2807310 24) 7781 * 808 = 6287048 25) 4086 * 250 = 1021500 26) 9645 * 978 = 9432810 27) 2553 * 833 = 2126649 28) 6058 * 450 = 2726100 29) 5178 * 483 = 2500974 30) 4532 * 284 = 1287088 31) 6041 * 878 = 5303998 32) 5666 * 911 = 5161726 33) 6735 * 920 = 6196200 34) 1621 * 886 = 1436206 35) 9580 * 125 = 1197500 36) 1343 * 506 = 679558 37) 5244 * 712 = 3733728 38) 8236 * 838 = 6901768 39) 2562 * 918 = 2351916 40) 7042 * 782 = 5506844 41) 5268 * 141 = 742788 42) 1610 * 160 = 257600 43) 4215 * 896 = 3776640 44) 8895 * 353 = 3139935 45) 6230 * 948 = 5906040 46) 3366 * 621 = 2090286 47) 2439 * 767 = 1870713 48) 3220 * 807 = 2598540 49) 5732 * 730 = 4184360 50) 3984 * 561 = 2235024

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 69

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 69

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets