JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 7

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 7

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 7, 2020.

Questions

1) 6941 x 326=
2) 5824 x 748=
3) 8806 x 317=
4) 6033 x 264=
5) 1570 x 570=
6) 2775 x 436=
7) 5464 x 131=
8) 6393 x 171=
9) 5018 x 588=
10) 2546 x 721=
11) 6197 x 571=
12) 9952 x 235=
13) 7357 x 406=
14) 4217 x 644=
15) 8903 x 896=
16) 4316 x 947=
17) 6159 x 179=
18) 2091 x 909=
19) 8321 x 450=
20) 6563 x 841=
21) 3041 x 856=
22) 1575 x 918=
23) 6844 x 522=
24) 4320 x 224=
25) 6194 x 556=
26) 5468 x 900=
27) 4222 x 593=
28) 1669 x 126=
29) 7608 x 689=
30) 7919 x 214=
31) 7061 x 585=
32) 2244 x 378=
33) 9703 x 319=
34) 7484 x 139=
35) 1093 x 750=
36) 7956 x 202=
37) 2584 x 969=
38) 8756 x 432=
39) 9397 x 216=
40) 6406 x 288=
41) 9110 x 241=
42) 5009 x 699=
43) 4613 x 875=
44) 4689 x 743=
45) 6985 x 597=
46) 1748 x 901=
47) 3717 x 273=
48) 2591 x 990=
49) 2986 x 344=
50) 8139 x 780=




Answers

1) 6941 * 326 = 2262766 2) 5824 * 748 = 4356352 3) 8806 * 317 = 2791502 4) 6033 * 264 = 1592712 5) 1570 * 570 = 894900 6) 2775 * 436 = 1209900 7) 5464 * 131 = 715784 8) 6393 * 171 = 1093203 9) 5018 * 588 = 2950584 10) 2546 * 721 = 1835666 11) 6197 * 571 = 3538487 12) 9952 * 235 = 2338720 13) 7357 * 406 = 2986942 14) 4217 * 644 = 2715748 15) 8903 * 896 = 7977088 16) 4316 * 947 = 4087252 17) 6159 * 179 = 1102461 18) 2091 * 909 = 1900719 19) 8321 * 450 = 3744450 20) 6563 * 841 = 5519483 21) 3041 * 856 = 2603096 22) 1575 * 918 = 1445850 23) 6844 * 522 = 3572568 24) 4320 * 224 = 967680 25) 6194 * 556 = 3443864 26) 5468 * 900 = 4921200 27) 4222 * 593 = 2503646 28) 1669 * 126 = 210294 29) 7608 * 689 = 5241912 30) 7919 * 214 = 1694666 31) 7061 * 585 = 4130685 32) 2244 * 378 = 848232 33) 9703 * 319 = 3095257 34) 7484 * 139 = 1040276 35) 1093 * 750 = 819750 36) 7956 * 202 = 1607112 37) 2584 * 969 = 2503896 38) 8756 * 432 = 3782592 39) 9397 * 216 = 2029752 40) 6406 * 288 = 1844928 41) 9110 * 241 = 2195510 42) 5009 * 699 = 3501291 43) 4613 * 875 = 4036375 44) 4689 * 743 = 3483927 45) 6985 * 597 = 4170045 46) 1748 * 901 = 1574948 47) 3717 * 273 = 1014741 48) 2591 * 990 = 2565090 49) 2986 * 344 = 1027184 50) 8139 * 780 = 6348420

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 7

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 7

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets