1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 70

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 70

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 5035 x 297=
2) 2990 x 675=
3) 3431 x 844=
4) 7934 x 261=
5) 2915 x 956=
6) 7576 x 400=
7) 1102 x 530=
8) 7294 x 957=
9) 8854 x 762=
10) 3955 x 461=
11) 8585 x 842=
12) 5794 x 364=
13) 8259 x 897=
14) 8180 x 305=
15) 4384 x 933=
16) 3886 x 622=
17) 5424 x 272=
18) 5231 x 884=
19) 3669 x 275=
20) 4379 x 885=
21) 2957 x 533=
22) 4306 x 256=
23) 1505 x 542=
24) 8344 x 389=
25) 7745 x 636=
26) 7572 x 441=
27) 4361 x 513=
28) 7712 x 792=
29) 9685 x 342=
30) 7384 x 134=
31) 2785 x 247=
32) 8480 x 776=
33) 3635 x 170=
34) 6511 x 783=
35) 3461 x 399=
36) 8313 x 336=
37) 7346 x 402=
38) 6981 x 244=
39) 9669 x 410=
40) 2214 x 169=
41) 7173 x 475=
42) 7153 x 542=
43) 2766 x 683=
44) 8741 x 858=
45) 8789 x 302=
46) 5835 x 465=
47) 3800 x 483=
48) 4950 x 746=
49) 4871 x 425=
50) 6868 x 407=




Answers

1) 5035 * 297 = 1495395 2) 2990 * 675 = 2018250 3) 3431 * 844 = 2895764 4) 7934 * 261 = 2070774 5) 2915 * 956 = 2786740 6) 7576 * 400 = 3030400 7) 1102 * 530 = 584060 8) 7294 * 957 = 6980358 9) 8854 * 762 = 6746748 10) 3955 * 461 = 1823255 11) 8585 * 842 = 7228570 12) 5794 * 364 = 2109016 13) 8259 * 897 = 7408323 14) 8180 * 305 = 2494900 15) 4384 * 933 = 4090272 16) 3886 * 622 = 2417092 17) 5424 * 272 = 1475328 18) 5231 * 884 = 4624204 19) 3669 * 275 = 1008975 20) 4379 * 885 = 3875415 21) 2957 * 533 = 1576081 22) 4306 * 256 = 1102336 23) 1505 * 542 = 815710 24) 8344 * 389 = 3245816 25) 7745 * 636 = 4925820 26) 7572 * 441 = 3339252 27) 4361 * 513 = 2237193 28) 7712 * 792 = 6107904 29) 9685 * 342 = 3312270 30) 7384 * 134 = 989456 31) 2785 * 247 = 687895 32) 8480 * 776 = 6580480 33) 3635 * 170 = 617950 34) 6511 * 783 = 5098113 35) 3461 * 399 = 1380939 36) 8313 * 336 = 2793168 37) 7346 * 402 = 2953092 38) 6981 * 244 = 1703364 39) 9669 * 410 = 3964290 40) 2214 * 169 = 374166 41) 7173 * 475 = 3407175 42) 7153 * 542 = 3876926 43) 2766 * 683 = 1889178 44) 8741 * 858 = 7499778 45) 8789 * 302 = 2654278 46) 5835 * 465 = 2713275 47) 3800 * 483 = 1835400 48) 4950 * 746 = 3692700 49) 4871 * 425 = 2070175 50) 6868 * 407 = 2795276

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 70

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 70

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets