JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 71

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 71

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 10, 2020.

Questions

1) 2884 x 547=
2) 5032 x 664=
3) 1424 x 989=
4) 7370 x 174=
5) 5221 x 431=
6) 1494 x 753=
7) 3366 x 141=
8) 8719 x 172=
9) 5293 x 615=
10) 4642 x 382=
11) 4276 x 760=
12) 7138 x 707=
13) 3458 x 284=
14) 3115 x 851=
15) 6740 x 108=
16) 3274 x 301=
17) 9412 x 720=
18) 7707 x 679=
19) 7488 x 671=
20) 9191 x 134=
21) 6466 x 595=
22) 7512 x 639=
23) 2108 x 826=
24) 2644 x 577=
25) 9653 x 537=
26) 6103 x 730=
27) 4062 x 372=
28) 8852 x 127=
29) 3259 x 618=
30) 5949 x 883=
31) 5942 x 431=
32) 2124 x 391=
33) 5841 x 496=
34) 2468 x 654=
35) 8672 x 754=
36) 8633 x 454=
37) 3880 x 624=
38) 7698 x 212=
39) 5956 x 847=
40) 9385 x 429=
41) 9862 x 220=
42) 2351 x 631=
43) 2699 x 839=
44) 9059 x 768=
45) 4212 x 859=
46) 4490 x 373=
47) 4852 x 651=
48) 5161 x 372=
49) 4307 x 186=
50) 4597 x 411=




Answers

1) 2884 * 547 = 1577548 2) 5032 * 664 = 3341248 3) 1424 * 989 = 1408336 4) 7370 * 174 = 1282380 5) 5221 * 431 = 2250251 6) 1494 * 753 = 1124982 7) 3366 * 141 = 474606 8) 8719 * 172 = 1499668 9) 5293 * 615 = 3255195 10) 4642 * 382 = 1773244 11) 4276 * 760 = 3249760 12) 7138 * 707 = 5046566 13) 3458 * 284 = 982072 14) 3115 * 851 = 2650865 15) 6740 * 108 = 727920 16) 3274 * 301 = 985474 17) 9412 * 720 = 6776640 18) 7707 * 679 = 5233053 19) 7488 * 671 = 5024448 20) 9191 * 134 = 1231594 21) 6466 * 595 = 3847270 22) 7512 * 639 = 4800168 23) 2108 * 826 = 1741208 24) 2644 * 577 = 1525588 25) 9653 * 537 = 5183661 26) 6103 * 730 = 4455190 27) 4062 * 372 = 1511064 28) 8852 * 127 = 1124204 29) 3259 * 618 = 2014062 30) 5949 * 883 = 5252967 31) 5942 * 431 = 2561002 32) 2124 * 391 = 830484 33) 5841 * 496 = 2897136 34) 2468 * 654 = 1614072 35) 8672 * 754 = 6538688 36) 8633 * 454 = 3919382 37) 3880 * 624 = 2421120 38) 7698 * 212 = 1631976 39) 5956 * 847 = 5044732 40) 9385 * 429 = 4026165 41) 9862 * 220 = 2169640 42) 2351 * 631 = 1483481 43) 2699 * 839 = 2264461 44) 9059 * 768 = 6957312 45) 4212 * 859 = 3618108 46) 4490 * 373 = 1674770 47) 4852 * 651 = 3158652 48) 5161 * 372 = 1919892 49) 4307 * 186 = 801102 50) 4597 * 411 = 1889367

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 71

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 71

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets