1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 72

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 72

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 11, 2020.

Questions

1) 8895 x 386=
2) 2395 x 475=
3) 3758 x 667=
4) 9022 x 187=
5) 2645 x 878=
6) 1920 x 464=
7) 3106 x 252=
8) 7217 x 245=
9) 6161 x 489=
10) 1016 x 309=
11) 7919 x 464=
12) 4198 x 667=
13) 1295 x 309=
14) 5935 x 339=
15) 2585 x 121=
16) 3782 x 202=
17) 7048 x 736=
18) 2747 x 731=
19) 7726 x 503=
20) 5585 x 942=
21) 7951 x 129=
22) 7281 x 616=
23) 6958 x 803=
24) 1302 x 794=
25) 9840 x 294=
26) 9782 x 735=
27) 9672 x 626=
28) 5369 x 461=
29) 6439 x 140=
30) 6799 x 595=
31) 5799 x 131=
32) 8757 x 160=
33) 8664 x 583=
34) 2976 x 248=
35) 7204 x 826=
36) 7481 x 316=
37) 8762 x 950=
38) 2079 x 648=
39) 5723 x 624=
40) 2500 x 357=
41) 7886 x 885=
42) 6066 x 684=
43) 7625 x 293=
44) 8836 x 395=
45) 9245 x 272=
46) 6016 x 681=
47) 9532 x 728=
48) 8777 x 393=
49) 4745 x 136=
50) 5995 x 688=




Answers

1) 8895 * 386 = 3433470 2) 2395 * 475 = 1137625 3) 3758 * 667 = 2506586 4) 9022 * 187 = 1687114 5) 2645 * 878 = 2322310 6) 1920 * 464 = 890880 7) 3106 * 252 = 782712 8) 7217 * 245 = 1768165 9) 6161 * 489 = 3012729 10) 1016 * 309 = 313944 11) 7919 * 464 = 3674416 12) 4198 * 667 = 2800066 13) 1295 * 309 = 400155 14) 5935 * 339 = 2011965 15) 2585 * 121 = 312785 16) 3782 * 202 = 763964 17) 7048 * 736 = 5187328 18) 2747 * 731 = 2008057 19) 7726 * 503 = 3886178 20) 5585 * 942 = 5261070 21) 7951 * 129 = 1025679 22) 7281 * 616 = 4485096 23) 6958 * 803 = 5587274 24) 1302 * 794 = 1033788 25) 9840 * 294 = 2892960 26) 9782 * 735 = 7189770 27) 9672 * 626 = 6054672 28) 5369 * 461 = 2475109 29) 6439 * 140 = 901460 30) 6799 * 595 = 4045405 31) 5799 * 131 = 759669 32) 8757 * 160 = 1401120 33) 8664 * 583 = 5051112 34) 2976 * 248 = 738048 35) 7204 * 826 = 5950504 36) 7481 * 316 = 2363996 37) 8762 * 950 = 8323900 38) 2079 * 648 = 1347192 39) 5723 * 624 = 3571152 40) 2500 * 357 = 892500 41) 7886 * 885 = 6979110 42) 6066 * 684 = 4149144 43) 7625 * 293 = 2234125 44) 8836 * 395 = 3490220 45) 9245 * 272 = 2514640 46) 6016 * 681 = 4096896 47) 9532 * 728 = 6939296 48) 8777 * 393 = 3449361 49) 4745 * 136 = 645320 50) 5995 * 688 = 4124560

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 72

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 72

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets