1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 73

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 73

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 8998 x 429=
2) 2591 x 205=
3) 7308 x 761=
4) 8659 x 599=
5) 2440 x 275=
6) 3546 x 895=
7) 4650 x 958=
8) 2700 x 815=
9) 4125 x 374=
10) 6984 x 238=
11) 2211 x 419=
12) 1080 x 793=
13) 2227 x 706=
14) 2461 x 502=
15) 6260 x 574=
16) 5776 x 244=
17) 4380 x 575=
18) 3319 x 879=
19) 1431 x 374=
20) 9324 x 551=
21) 6248 x 399=
22) 9579 x 490=
23) 4382 x 562=
24) 6572 x 666=
25) 1278 x 810=
26) 3352 x 177=
27) 1130 x 463=
28) 5965 x 567=
29) 6579 x 836=
30) 1328 x 788=
31) 3621 x 270=
32) 7644 x 675=
33) 7187 x 310=
34) 2366 x 393=
35) 6824 x 490=
36) 4437 x 574=
37) 7774 x 497=
38) 6833 x 312=
39) 5997 x 455=
40) 8582 x 658=
41) 6272 x 726=
42) 7765 x 518=
43) 5624 x 650=
44) 2246 x 929=
45) 9027 x 210=
46) 7884 x 546=
47) 1545 x 718=
48) 5961 x 224=
49) 4969 x 668=
50) 4440 x 446=




Answers

1) 8998 * 429 = 3860142 2) 2591 * 205 = 531155 3) 7308 * 761 = 5561388 4) 8659 * 599 = 5186741 5) 2440 * 275 = 671000 6) 3546 * 895 = 3173670 7) 4650 * 958 = 4454700 8) 2700 * 815 = 2200500 9) 4125 * 374 = 1542750 10) 6984 * 238 = 1662192 11) 2211 * 419 = 926409 12) 1080 * 793 = 856440 13) 2227 * 706 = 1572262 14) 2461 * 502 = 1235422 15) 6260 * 574 = 3593240 16) 5776 * 244 = 1409344 17) 4380 * 575 = 2518500 18) 3319 * 879 = 2917401 19) 1431 * 374 = 535194 20) 9324 * 551 = 5137524 21) 6248 * 399 = 2492952 22) 9579 * 490 = 4693710 23) 4382 * 562 = 2462684 24) 6572 * 666 = 4376952 25) 1278 * 810 = 1035180 26) 3352 * 177 = 593304 27) 1130 * 463 = 523190 28) 5965 * 567 = 3382155 29) 6579 * 836 = 5500044 30) 1328 * 788 = 1046464 31) 3621 * 270 = 977670 32) 7644 * 675 = 5159700 33) 7187 * 310 = 2227970 34) 2366 * 393 = 929838 35) 6824 * 490 = 3343760 36) 4437 * 574 = 2546838 37) 7774 * 497 = 3863678 38) 6833 * 312 = 2131896 39) 5997 * 455 = 2728635 40) 8582 * 658 = 5646956 41) 6272 * 726 = 4553472 42) 7765 * 518 = 4022270 43) 5624 * 650 = 3655600 44) 2246 * 929 = 2086534 45) 9027 * 210 = 1895670 46) 7884 * 546 = 4304664 47) 1545 * 718 = 1109310 48) 5961 * 224 = 1335264 49) 4969 * 668 = 3319292 50) 4440 * 446 = 1980240

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 73

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 73

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets