1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 74

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 74

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on November 13, 2020.

Questions

1) 5103 x 306=
2) 1110 x 648=
3) 3800 x 658=
4) 4079 x 399=
5) 1095 x 172=
6) 1238 x 839=
7) 2002 x 960=
8) 2923 x 592=
9) 2262 x 512=
10) 9693 x 329=
11) 2720 x 296=
12) 8184 x 262=
13) 7883 x 836=
14) 2576 x 108=
15) 7171 x 975=
16) 8669 x 879=
17) 4420 x 971=
18) 5674 x 272=
19) 4000 x 717=
20) 9555 x 565=
21) 1397 x 440=
22) 3634 x 579=
23) 8245 x 273=
24) 9666 x 438=
25) 8070 x 933=
26) 9650 x 968=
27) 2945 x 686=
28) 5893 x 675=
29) 3018 x 700=
30) 6300 x 597=
31) 5653 x 412=
32) 7311 x 687=
33) 2989 x 840=
34) 3530 x 617=
35) 8319 x 148=
36) 8535 x 831=
37) 2272 x 582=
38) 6142 x 465=
39) 9312 x 155=
40) 7482 x 458=
41) 4756 x 303=
42) 2834 x 857=
43) 7805 x 882=
44) 4518 x 592=
45) 4120 x 772=
46) 6516 x 169=
47) 9639 x 644=
48) 1097 x 342=
49) 5244 x 250=
50) 4034 x 713=




Answers

1) 5103 * 306 = 1561518 2) 1110 * 648 = 719280 3) 3800 * 658 = 2500400 4) 4079 * 399 = 1627521 5) 1095 * 172 = 188340 6) 1238 * 839 = 1038682 7) 2002 * 960 = 1921920 8) 2923 * 592 = 1730416 9) 2262 * 512 = 1158144 10) 9693 * 329 = 3188997 11) 2720 * 296 = 805120 12) 8184 * 262 = 2144208 13) 7883 * 836 = 6590188 14) 2576 * 108 = 278208 15) 7171 * 975 = 6991725 16) 8669 * 879 = 7620051 17) 4420 * 971 = 4291820 18) 5674 * 272 = 1543328 19) 4000 * 717 = 2868000 20) 9555 * 565 = 5398575 21) 1397 * 440 = 614680 22) 3634 * 579 = 2104086 23) 8245 * 273 = 2250885 24) 9666 * 438 = 4233708 25) 8070 * 933 = 7529310 26) 9650 * 968 = 9341200 27) 2945 * 686 = 2020270 28) 5893 * 675 = 3977775 29) 3018 * 700 = 2112600 30) 6300 * 597 = 3761100 31) 5653 * 412 = 2329036 32) 7311 * 687 = 5022657 33) 2989 * 840 = 2510760 34) 3530 * 617 = 2178010 35) 8319 * 148 = 1231212 36) 8535 * 831 = 7092585 37) 2272 * 582 = 1322304 38) 6142 * 465 = 2856030 39) 9312 * 155 = 1443360 40) 7482 * 458 = 3426756 41) 4756 * 303 = 1441068 42) 2834 * 857 = 2428738 43) 7805 * 882 = 6884010 44) 4518 * 592 = 2674656 45) 4120 * 772 = 3180640 46) 6516 * 169 = 1101204 47) 9639 * 644 = 6207516 48) 1097 * 342 = 375174 49) 5244 * 250 = 1311000 50) 4034 * 713 = 2876242

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 74

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 74

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets