1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 75

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 75

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on November 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 6281 x 218=
2) 7980 x 328=
3) 7016 x 306=
4) 4909 x 612=
5) 8099 x 364=
6) 5203 x 380=
7) 2290 x 898=
8) 3687 x 718=
9) 9821 x 255=
10) 2210 x 390=
11) 5892 x 157=
12) 4739 x 691=
13) 5902 x 529=
14) 6280 x 618=
15) 8201 x 405=
16) 9054 x 99=
17) 3597 x 527=
18) 7728 x 714=
19) 1577 x 561=
20) 5025 x 398=
21) 9993 x 975=
22) 7536 x 294=
23) 8347 x 487=
24) 7915 x 503=
25) 9562 x 445=
26) 1236 x 655=
27) 8621 x 284=
28) 4399 x 915=
29) 2559 x 665=
30) 5562 x 516=
31) 3291 x 856=
32) 2528 x 207=
33) 5686 x 694=
34) 6651 x 953=
35) 4328 x 959=
36) 3407 x 551=
37) 3529 x 601=
38) 7351 x 261=
39) 5936 x 390=
40) 3713 x 521=
41) 2499 x 555=
42) 9703 x 986=
43) 4751 x 476=
44) 4530 x 567=
45) 8720 x 388=
46) 5756 x 613=
47) 7649 x 299=
48) 8450 x 798=
49) 3271 x 119=
50) 3647 x 148=




Answers

1) 6281 * 218 = 1369258 2) 7980 * 328 = 2617440 3) 7016 * 306 = 2146896 4) 4909 * 612 = 3004308 5) 8099 * 364 = 2948036 6) 5203 * 380 = 1977140 7) 2290 * 898 = 2056420 8) 3687 * 718 = 2647266 9) 9821 * 255 = 2504355 10) 2210 * 390 = 861900 11) 5892 * 157 = 925044 12) 4739 * 691 = 3274649 13) 5902 * 529 = 3122158 14) 6280 * 618 = 3881040 15) 8201 * 405 = 3321405 16) 9054 * 99 = 896346 17) 3597 * 527 = 1895619 18) 7728 * 714 = 5517792 19) 1577 * 561 = 884697 20) 5025 * 398 = 1999950 21) 9993 * 975 = 9743175 22) 7536 * 294 = 2215584 23) 8347 * 487 = 4064989 24) 7915 * 503 = 3981245 25) 9562 * 445 = 4255090 26) 1236 * 655 = 809580 27) 8621 * 284 = 2448364 28) 4399 * 915 = 4025085 29) 2559 * 665 = 1701735 30) 5562 * 516 = 2869992 31) 3291 * 856 = 2817096 32) 2528 * 207 = 523296 33) 5686 * 694 = 3946084 34) 6651 * 953 = 6338403 35) 4328 * 959 = 4150552 36) 3407 * 551 = 1877257 37) 3529 * 601 = 2120929 38) 7351 * 261 = 1918611 39) 5936 * 390 = 2315040 40) 3713 * 521 = 1934473 41) 2499 * 555 = 1386945 42) 9703 * 986 = 9567158 43) 4751 * 476 = 2261476 44) 4530 * 567 = 2568510 45) 8720 * 388 = 3383360 46) 5756 * 613 = 3528428 47) 7649 * 299 = 2287051 48) 8450 * 798 = 6743100 49) 3271 * 119 = 389249 50) 3647 * 148 = 539756

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 75

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 75

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets