1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 76

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 76

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 15, 2020.

Questions

1) 3715 x 329=
2) 4221 x 437=
3) 6562 x 264=
4) 8943 x 306=
5) 8642 x 927=
6) 2807 x 352=
7) 4638 x 785=
8) 5104 x 777=
9) 3983 x 521=
10) 4426 x 596=
11) 4401 x 782=
12) 6157 x 233=
13) 1506 x 641=
14) 7264 x 842=
15) 8505 x 981=
16) 1488 x 881=
17) 4614 x 978=
18) 5467 x 336=
19) 5842 x 166=
20) 7075 x 882=
21) 7733 x 806=
22) 1217 x 462=
23) 5785 x 128=
24) 7284 x 108=
25) 5041 x 770=
26) 3692 x 207=
27) 5856 x 711=
28) 8843 x 168=
29) 2113 x 303=
30) 6438 x 368=
31) 3254 x 559=
32) 6564 x 332=
33) 3194 x 402=
34) 2182 x 346=
35) 3881 x 660=
36) 8717 x 161=
37) 7019 x 707=
38) 8905 x 754=
39) 8746 x 559=
40) 4720 x 414=
41) 3208 x 805=
42) 7609 x 843=
43) 8691 x 736=
44) 4197 x 501=
45) 8561 x 883=
46) 2341 x 571=
47) 3486 x 699=
48) 9368 x 711=
49) 7012 x 563=
50) 4368 x 935=




Answers

1) 3715 * 329 = 1222235 2) 4221 * 437 = 1844577 3) 6562 * 264 = 1732368 4) 8943 * 306 = 2736558 5) 8642 * 927 = 8011134 6) 2807 * 352 = 988064 7) 4638 * 785 = 3640830 8) 5104 * 777 = 3965808 9) 3983 * 521 = 2075143 10) 4426 * 596 = 2637896 11) 4401 * 782 = 3441582 12) 6157 * 233 = 1434581 13) 1506 * 641 = 965346 14) 7264 * 842 = 6116288 15) 8505 * 981 = 8343405 16) 1488 * 881 = 1310928 17) 4614 * 978 = 4512492 18) 5467 * 336 = 1836912 19) 5842 * 166 = 969772 20) 7075 * 882 = 6240150 21) 7733 * 806 = 6232798 22) 1217 * 462 = 562254 23) 5785 * 128 = 740480 24) 7284 * 108 = 786672 25) 5041 * 770 = 3881570 26) 3692 * 207 = 764244 27) 5856 * 711 = 4163616 28) 8843 * 168 = 1485624 29) 2113 * 303 = 640239 30) 6438 * 368 = 2369184 31) 3254 * 559 = 1818986 32) 6564 * 332 = 2179248 33) 3194 * 402 = 1283988 34) 2182 * 346 = 754972 35) 3881 * 660 = 2561460 36) 8717 * 161 = 1403437 37) 7019 * 707 = 4962433 38) 8905 * 754 = 6714370 39) 8746 * 559 = 4889014 40) 4720 * 414 = 1954080 41) 3208 * 805 = 2582440 42) 7609 * 843 = 6414387 43) 8691 * 736 = 6396576 44) 4197 * 501 = 2102697 45) 8561 * 883 = 7559363 46) 2341 * 571 = 1336711 47) 3486 * 699 = 2436714 48) 9368 * 711 = 6660648 49) 7012 * 563 = 3947756 50) 4368 * 935 = 4084080

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 76

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 76

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets