1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 77

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 77

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on November 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 6023 x 285=
2) 4301 x 592=
3) 7200 x 834=
4) 3421 x 404=
5) 8750 x 488=
6) 6286 x 269=
7) 6177 x 161=
8) 6024 x 493=
9) 9152 x 879=
10) 7788 x 212=
11) 8440 x 630=
12) 1830 x 768=
13) 1355 x 611=
14) 4505 x 240=
15) 6100 x 973=
16) 6534 x 216=
17) 6386 x 151=
18) 8821 x 751=
19) 4567 x 637=
20) 8423 x 832=
21) 6164 x 647=
22) 1685 x 429=
23) 1186 x 522=
24) 7626 x 589=
25) 9672 x 927=
26) 8214 x 279=
27) 5787 x 366=
28) 5154 x 889=
29) 3427 x 519=
30) 3682 x 785=
31) 9835 x 752=
32) 1003 x 809=
33) 9675 x 579=
34) 5979 x 354=
35) 4941 x 194=
36) 1335 x 261=
37) 5312 x 389=
38) 6453 x 472=
39) 6167 x 337=
40) 7406 x 456=
41) 8754 x 181=
42) 4848 x 943=
43) 1182 x 235=
44) 7442 x 750=
45) 3686 x 659=
46) 4113 x 809=
47) 4951 x 527=
48) 5113 x 526=
49) 6517 x 652=
50) 3103 x 143=




Answers

1) 6023 * 285 = 1716555 2) 4301 * 592 = 2546192 3) 7200 * 834 = 6004800 4) 3421 * 404 = 1382084 5) 8750 * 488 = 4270000 6) 6286 * 269 = 1690934 7) 6177 * 161 = 994497 8) 6024 * 493 = 2969832 9) 9152 * 879 = 8044608 10) 7788 * 212 = 1651056 11) 8440 * 630 = 5317200 12) 1830 * 768 = 1405440 13) 1355 * 611 = 827905 14) 4505 * 240 = 1081200 15) 6100 * 973 = 5935300 16) 6534 * 216 = 1411344 17) 6386 * 151 = 964286 18) 8821 * 751 = 6624571 19) 4567 * 637 = 2909179 20) 8423 * 832 = 7007936 21) 6164 * 647 = 3988108 22) 1685 * 429 = 722865 23) 1186 * 522 = 619092 24) 7626 * 589 = 4491714 25) 9672 * 927 = 8965944 26) 8214 * 279 = 2291706 27) 5787 * 366 = 2118042 28) 5154 * 889 = 4581906 29) 3427 * 519 = 1778613 30) 3682 * 785 = 2890370 31) 9835 * 752 = 7395920 32) 1003 * 809 = 811427 33) 9675 * 579 = 5601825 34) 5979 * 354 = 2116566 35) 4941 * 194 = 958554 36) 1335 * 261 = 348435 37) 5312 * 389 = 2066368 38) 6453 * 472 = 3045816 39) 6167 * 337 = 2078279 40) 7406 * 456 = 3377136 41) 8754 * 181 = 1584474 42) 4848 * 943 = 4571664 43) 1182 * 235 = 277770 44) 7442 * 750 = 5581500 45) 3686 * 659 = 2429074 46) 4113 * 809 = 3327417 47) 4951 * 527 = 2609177 48) 5113 * 526 = 2689438 49) 6517 * 652 = 4249084 50) 3103 * 143 = 443729

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 77

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 77

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets