1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 78

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 78

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on November 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 8761 x 939=
2) 8157 x 762=
3) 7709 x 896=
4) 1536 x 972=
5) 3274 x 984=
6) 4787 x 551=
7) 6533 x 545=
8) 2519 x 343=
9) 1443 x 870=
10) 2252 x 517=
11) 8812 x 346=
12) 6822 x 659=
13) 2062 x 876=
14) 8843 x 521=
15) 9568 x 607=
16) 7974 x 749=
17) 5351 x 360=
18) 5953 x 267=
19) 4127 x 916=
20) 2020 x 135=
21) 4154 x 366=
22) 9008 x 438=
23) 2150 x 126=
24) 7205 x 908=
25) 3090 x 859=
26) 6537 x 568=
27) 5593 x 643=
28) 1830 x 272=
29) 6299 x 980=
30) 1078 x 632=
31) 2674 x 581=
32) 9367 x 411=
33) 7022 x 816=
34) 8696 x 214=
35) 5846 x 315=
36) 3846 x 979=
37) 3408 x 239=
38) 8723 x 421=
39) 3928 x 328=
40) 2293 x 563=
41) 2236 x 502=
42) 9816 x 863=
43) 4798 x 184=
44) 3809 x 566=
45) 4895 x 170=
46) 7436 x 366=
47) 2209 x 719=
48) 7670 x 405=
49) 1918 x 950=
50) 3752 x 361=




Answers

1) 8761 * 939 = 8226579 2) 8157 * 762 = 6215634 3) 7709 * 896 = 6907264 4) 1536 * 972 = 1492992 5) 3274 * 984 = 3221616 6) 4787 * 551 = 2637637 7) 6533 * 545 = 3560485 8) 2519 * 343 = 864017 9) 1443 * 870 = 1255410 10) 2252 * 517 = 1164284 11) 8812 * 346 = 3048952 12) 6822 * 659 = 4495698 13) 2062 * 876 = 1806312 14) 8843 * 521 = 4607203 15) 9568 * 607 = 5807776 16) 7974 * 749 = 5972526 17) 5351 * 360 = 1926360 18) 5953 * 267 = 1589451 19) 4127 * 916 = 3780332 20) 2020 * 135 = 272700 21) 4154 * 366 = 1520364 22) 9008 * 438 = 3945504 23) 2150 * 126 = 270900 24) 7205 * 908 = 6542140 25) 3090 * 859 = 2654310 26) 6537 * 568 = 3713016 27) 5593 * 643 = 3596299 28) 1830 * 272 = 497760 29) 6299 * 980 = 6173020 30) 1078 * 632 = 681296 31) 2674 * 581 = 1553594 32) 9367 * 411 = 3849837 33) 7022 * 816 = 5729952 34) 8696 * 214 = 1860944 35) 5846 * 315 = 1841490 36) 3846 * 979 = 3765234 37) 3408 * 239 = 814512 38) 8723 * 421 = 3672383 39) 3928 * 328 = 1288384 40) 2293 * 563 = 1290959 41) 2236 * 502 = 1122472 42) 9816 * 863 = 8471208 43) 4798 * 184 = 882832 44) 3809 * 566 = 2155894 45) 4895 * 170 = 832150 46) 7436 * 366 = 2721576 47) 2209 * 719 = 1588271 48) 7670 * 405 = 3106350 49) 1918 * 950 = 1822100 50) 3752 * 361 = 1354472

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 78

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 78

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets