1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 79

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 79

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on November 18, 2020.

Questions

1) 7934 x 195=
2) 1403 x 114=
3) 1331 x 173=
4) 8507 x 342=
5) 5118 x 623=
6) 8588 x 701=
7) 1055 x 748=
8) 4789 x 717=
9) 1608 x 790=
10) 1775 x 145=
11) 5240 x 492=
12) 7396 x 698=
13) 5733 x 175=
14) 8358 x 365=
15) 7635 x 388=
16) 7383 x 830=
17) 1571 x 452=
18) 3003 x 890=
19) 7009 x 596=
20) 1206 x 205=
21) 4809 x 285=
22) 2467 x 674=
23) 4137 x 939=
24) 2692 x 211=
25) 1635 x 443=
26) 5933 x 665=
27) 2744 x 154=
28) 7489 x 680=
29) 5583 x 220=
30) 2846 x 754=
31) 8772 x 398=
32) 1670 x 737=
33) 7752 x 902=
34) 5395 x 189=
35) 7393 x 454=
36) 7455 x 497=
37) 5705 x 392=
38) 1126 x 613=
39) 5793 x 960=
40) 3165 x 628=
41) 8992 x 243=
42) 3368 x 353=
43) 7676 x 327=
44) 2540 x 698=
45) 1925 x 545=
46) 9651 x 578=
47) 2899 x 178=
48) 7031 x 766=
49) 2050 x 472=
50) 3713 x 803=




Answers

1) 7934 * 195 = 1547130 2) 1403 * 114 = 159942 3) 1331 * 173 = 230263 4) 8507 * 342 = 2909394 5) 5118 * 623 = 3188514 6) 8588 * 701 = 6020188 7) 1055 * 748 = 789140 8) 4789 * 717 = 3433713 9) 1608 * 790 = 1270320 10) 1775 * 145 = 257375 11) 5240 * 492 = 2578080 12) 7396 * 698 = 5162408 13) 5733 * 175 = 1003275 14) 8358 * 365 = 3050670 15) 7635 * 388 = 2962380 16) 7383 * 830 = 6127890 17) 1571 * 452 = 710092 18) 3003 * 890 = 2672670 19) 7009 * 596 = 4177364 20) 1206 * 205 = 247230 21) 4809 * 285 = 1370565 22) 2467 * 674 = 1662758 23) 4137 * 939 = 3884643 24) 2692 * 211 = 568012 25) 1635 * 443 = 724305 26) 5933 * 665 = 3945445 27) 2744 * 154 = 422576 28) 7489 * 680 = 5092520 29) 5583 * 220 = 1228260 30) 2846 * 754 = 2145884 31) 8772 * 398 = 3491256 32) 1670 * 737 = 1230790 33) 7752 * 902 = 6992304 34) 5395 * 189 = 1019655 35) 7393 * 454 = 3356422 36) 7455 * 497 = 3705135 37) 5705 * 392 = 2236360 38) 1126 * 613 = 690238 39) 5793 * 960 = 5561280 40) 3165 * 628 = 1987620 41) 8992 * 243 = 2185056 42) 3368 * 353 = 1188904 43) 7676 * 327 = 2510052 44) 2540 * 698 = 1772920 45) 1925 * 545 = 1049125 46) 9651 * 578 = 5578278 47) 2899 * 178 = 516022 48) 7031 * 766 = 5385746 49) 2050 * 472 = 967600 50) 3713 * 803 = 2981539

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 79

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 79

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets