JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 8

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 8

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 5887 x 138=
2) 2566 x 168=
3) 3188 x 521=
4) 5690 x 508=
5) 7525 x 117=
6) 5337 x 437=
7) 6444 x 734=
8) 8994 x 697=
9) 8558 x 993=
10) 1395 x 841=
11) 3336 x 751=
12) 9583 x 106=
13) 5530 x 844=
14) 5734 x 390=
15) 8846 x 257=
16) 7451 x 332=
17) 2833 x 125=
18) 9202 x 750=
19) 3576 x 767=
20) 6920 x 837=
21) 7269 x 816=
22) 2486 x 759=
23) 3608 x 811=
24) 9673 x 258=
25) 8489 x 200=
26) 3670 x 148=
27) 9019 x 332=
28) 4276 x 216=
29) 3830 x 978=
30) 8650 x 611=
31) 9393 x 749=
32) 5202 x 437=
33) 2713 x 177=
34) 5652 x 151=
35) 3374 x 699=
36) 3001 x 912=
37) 1299 x 964=
38) 1916 x 415=
39) 9824 x 550=
40) 6772 x 483=
41) 5300 x 631=
42) 6227 x 401=
43) 2885 x 740=
44) 3995 x 127=
45) 8610 x 558=
46) 9184 x 693=
47) 1174 x 737=
48) 5682 x 968=
49) 3275 x 806=
50) 4057 x 487=




Answers

1) 5887 * 138 = 812406 2) 2566 * 168 = 431088 3) 3188 * 521 = 1660948 4) 5690 * 508 = 2890520 5) 7525 * 117 = 880425 6) 5337 * 437 = 2332269 7) 6444 * 734 = 4729896 8) 8994 * 697 = 6268818 9) 8558 * 993 = 8498094 10) 1395 * 841 = 1173195 11) 3336 * 751 = 2505336 12) 9583 * 106 = 1015798 13) 5530 * 844 = 4667320 14) 5734 * 390 = 2236260 15) 8846 * 257 = 2273422 16) 7451 * 332 = 2473732 17) 2833 * 125 = 354125 18) 9202 * 750 = 6901500 19) 3576 * 767 = 2742792 20) 6920 * 837 = 5792040 21) 7269 * 816 = 5931504 22) 2486 * 759 = 1886874 23) 3608 * 811 = 2926088 24) 9673 * 258 = 2495634 25) 8489 * 200 = 1697800 26) 3670 * 148 = 543160 27) 9019 * 332 = 2994308 28) 4276 * 216 = 923616 29) 3830 * 978 = 3745740 30) 8650 * 611 = 5285150 31) 9393 * 749 = 7035357 32) 5202 * 437 = 2273274 33) 2713 * 177 = 480201 34) 5652 * 151 = 853452 35) 3374 * 699 = 2358426 36) 3001 * 912 = 2736912 37) 1299 * 964 = 1252236 38) 1916 * 415 = 795140 39) 9824 * 550 = 5403200 40) 6772 * 483 = 3270876 41) 5300 * 631 = 3344300 42) 6227 * 401 = 2497027 43) 2885 * 740 = 2134900 44) 3995 * 127 = 507365 45) 8610 * 558 = 4804380 46) 9184 * 693 = 6364512 47) 1174 * 737 = 865238 48) 5682 * 968 = 5500176 49) 3275 * 806 = 2639650 50) 4057 * 487 = 1975759

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 8

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 8

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets