JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 80

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 80

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 7301 x 868=
2) 1616 x 827=
3) 4887 x 141=
4) 2575 x 118=
5) 2695 x 477=
6) 5971 x 727=
7) 5493 x 187=
8) 5055 x 396=
9) 5460 x 326=
10) 7497 x 143=
11) 6031 x 380=
12) 4516 x 979=
13) 6968 x 905=
14) 2310 x 198=
15) 1819 x 604=
16) 7507 x 537=
17) 6096 x 876=
18) 4363 x 370=
19) 4253 x 435=
20) 8657 x 632=
21) 3239 x 436=
22) 9219 x 619=
23) 2206 x 236=
24) 1961 x 677=
25) 3012 x 184=
26) 3869 x 518=
27) 8771 x 173=
28) 1614 x 775=
29) 8960 x 608=
30) 4370 x 353=
31) 7569 x 486=
32) 3876 x 866=
33) 6237 x 577=
34) 3836 x 169=
35) 6200 x 770=
36) 5599 x 662=
37) 1798 x 684=
38) 5109 x 941=
39) 5630 x 662=
40) 4459 x 377=
41) 9148 x 271=
42) 8192 x 424=
43) 5182 x 249=
44) 5566 x 830=
45) 8972 x 399=
46) 9461 x 701=
47) 6496 x 832=
48) 3084 x 407=
49) 3334 x 324=
50) 4176 x 938=




Answers

1) 7301 * 868 = 6337268 2) 1616 * 827 = 1336432 3) 4887 * 141 = 689067 4) 2575 * 118 = 303850 5) 2695 * 477 = 1285515 6) 5971 * 727 = 4340917 7) 5493 * 187 = 1027191 8) 5055 * 396 = 2001780 9) 5460 * 326 = 1779960 10) 7497 * 143 = 1072071 11) 6031 * 380 = 2291780 12) 4516 * 979 = 4421164 13) 6968 * 905 = 6306040 14) 2310 * 198 = 457380 15) 1819 * 604 = 1098676 16) 7507 * 537 = 4031259 17) 6096 * 876 = 5340096 18) 4363 * 370 = 1614310 19) 4253 * 435 = 1850055 20) 8657 * 632 = 5471224 21) 3239 * 436 = 1412204 22) 9219 * 619 = 5706561 23) 2206 * 236 = 520616 24) 1961 * 677 = 1327597 25) 3012 * 184 = 554208 26) 3869 * 518 = 2004142 27) 8771 * 173 = 1517383 28) 1614 * 775 = 1250850 29) 8960 * 608 = 5447680 30) 4370 * 353 = 1542610 31) 7569 * 486 = 3678534 32) 3876 * 866 = 3356616 33) 6237 * 577 = 3598749 34) 3836 * 169 = 648284 35) 6200 * 770 = 4774000 36) 5599 * 662 = 3706538 37) 1798 * 684 = 1229832 38) 5109 * 941 = 4807569 39) 5630 * 662 = 3727060 40) 4459 * 377 = 1681043 41) 9148 * 271 = 2479108 42) 8192 * 424 = 3473408 43) 5182 * 249 = 1290318 44) 5566 * 830 = 4619780 45) 8972 * 399 = 3579828 46) 9461 * 701 = 6632161 47) 6496 * 832 = 5404672 48) 3084 * 407 = 1255188 49) 3334 * 324 = 1080216 50) 4176 * 938 = 3917088

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 80

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 80

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets