JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 20, 2020.

Questions

1) 1726 x 970=
2) 5044 x 328=
3) 9638 x 608=
4) 1261 x 875=
5) 3131 x 524=
6) 2038 x 303=
7) 7292 x 635=
8) 6914 x 752=
9) 8335 x 254=
10) 6956 x 617=
11) 5723 x 743=
12) 3158 x 453=
13) 8712 x 801=
14) 4116 x 248=
15) 4589 x 260=
16) 9871 x 340=
17) 9681 x 125=
18) 3910 x 225=
19) 4012 x 837=
20) 2024 x 926=
21) 1517 x 924=
22) 2830 x 222=
23) 6366 x 267=
24) 9095 x 714=
25) 3040 x 812=
26) 3705 x 263=
27) 3256 x 528=
28) 7744 x 800=
29) 6603 x 396=
30) 2295 x 695=
31) 9502 x 471=
32) 4491 x 910=
33) 9076 x 132=
34) 6097 x 833=
35) 2376 x 138=
36) 6327 x 487=
37) 8651 x 873=
38) 1444 x 702=
39) 3237 x 955=
40) 5367 x 815=
41) 5187 x 881=
42) 5604 x 197=
43) 7641 x 404=
44) 8939 x 451=
45) 5557 x 796=
46) 9979 x 230=
47) 9479 x 828=
48) 3877 x 691=
49) 1218 x 114=
50) 7255 x 764=




Answers

1) 1726 * 970 = 1674220 2) 5044 * 328 = 1654432 3) 9638 * 608 = 5859904 4) 1261 * 875 = 1103375 5) 3131 * 524 = 1640644 6) 2038 * 303 = 617514 7) 7292 * 635 = 4630420 8) 6914 * 752 = 5199328 9) 8335 * 254 = 2117090 10) 6956 * 617 = 4291852 11) 5723 * 743 = 4252189 12) 3158 * 453 = 1430574 13) 8712 * 801 = 6978312 14) 4116 * 248 = 1020768 15) 4589 * 260 = 1193140 16) 9871 * 340 = 3356140 17) 9681 * 125 = 1210125 18) 3910 * 225 = 879750 19) 4012 * 837 = 3358044 20) 2024 * 926 = 1874224 21) 1517 * 924 = 1401708 22) 2830 * 222 = 628260 23) 6366 * 267 = 1699722 24) 9095 * 714 = 6493830 25) 3040 * 812 = 2468480 26) 3705 * 263 = 974415 27) 3256 * 528 = 1719168 28) 7744 * 800 = 6195200 29) 6603 * 396 = 2614788 30) 2295 * 695 = 1595025 31) 9502 * 471 = 4475442 32) 4491 * 910 = 4086810 33) 9076 * 132 = 1198032 34) 6097 * 833 = 5078801 35) 2376 * 138 = 327888 36) 6327 * 487 = 3081249 37) 8651 * 873 = 7552323 38) 1444 * 702 = 1013688 39) 3237 * 955 = 3091335 40) 5367 * 815 = 4374105 41) 5187 * 881 = 4569747 42) 5604 * 197 = 1103988 43) 7641 * 404 = 3086964 44) 8939 * 451 = 4031489 45) 5557 * 796 = 4423372 46) 9979 * 230 = 2295170 47) 9479 * 828 = 7848612 48) 3877 * 691 = 2679007 49) 1218 * 114 = 138852 50) 7255 * 764 = 5542820

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets