JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 82

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 82

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 21, 2020.

Questions

1) 5133 x 522=
2) 4702 x 155=
3) 4604 x 614=
4) 4570 x 165=
5) 8176 x 709=
6) 6551 x 698=
7) 9676 x 445=
8) 7632 x 512=
9) 2086 x 936=
10) 6768 x 583=
11) 7948 x 258=
12) 4179 x 424=
13) 4757 x 145=
14) 2214 x 277=
15) 3878 x 936=
16) 7676 x 824=
17) 4648 x 990=
18) 7661 x 657=
19) 6466 x 117=
20) 1060 x 878=
21) 4596 x 463=
22) 6492 x 616=
23) 3337 x 521=
24) 3333 x 206=
25) 9103 x 406=
26) 6418 x 907=
27) 6369 x 284=
28) 3174 x 179=
29) 7243 x 573=
30) 7281 x 632=
31) 6223 x 533=
32) 6253 x 775=
33) 8915 x 337=
34) 9334 x 244=
35) 1884 x 406=
36) 3402 x 936=
37) 7288 x 847=
38) 7261 x 201=
39) 8857 x 464=
40) 7944 x 108=
41) 1227 x 734=
42) 6186 x 276=
43) 4153 x 794=
44) 2335 x 469=
45) 9362 x 105=
46) 9189 x 875=
47) 3945 x 375=
48) 8199 x 553=
49) 8730 x 851=
50) 4838 x 907=




Answers

1) 5133 * 522 = 2679426 2) 4702 * 155 = 728810 3) 4604 * 614 = 2826856 4) 4570 * 165 = 754050 5) 8176 * 709 = 5796784 6) 6551 * 698 = 4572598 7) 9676 * 445 = 4305820 8) 7632 * 512 = 3907584 9) 2086 * 936 = 1952496 10) 6768 * 583 = 3945744 11) 7948 * 258 = 2050584 12) 4179 * 424 = 1771896 13) 4757 * 145 = 689765 14) 2214 * 277 = 613278 15) 3878 * 936 = 3629808 16) 7676 * 824 = 6325024 17) 4648 * 990 = 4601520 18) 7661 * 657 = 5033277 19) 6466 * 117 = 756522 20) 1060 * 878 = 930680 21) 4596 * 463 = 2127948 22) 6492 * 616 = 3999072 23) 3337 * 521 = 1738577 24) 3333 * 206 = 686598 25) 9103 * 406 = 3695818 26) 6418 * 907 = 5821126 27) 6369 * 284 = 1808796 28) 3174 * 179 = 568146 29) 7243 * 573 = 4150239 30) 7281 * 632 = 4601592 31) 6223 * 533 = 3316859 32) 6253 * 775 = 4846075 33) 8915 * 337 = 3004355 34) 9334 * 244 = 2277496 35) 1884 * 406 = 764904 36) 3402 * 936 = 3184272 37) 7288 * 847 = 6172936 38) 7261 * 201 = 1459461 39) 8857 * 464 = 4109648 40) 7944 * 108 = 857952 41) 1227 * 734 = 900618 42) 6186 * 276 = 1707336 43) 4153 * 794 = 3297482 44) 2335 * 469 = 1095115 45) 9362 * 105 = 983010 46) 9189 * 875 = 8040375 47) 3945 * 375 = 1479375 48) 8199 * 553 = 4534047 49) 8730 * 851 = 7429230 50) 4838 * 907 = 4388066

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 82

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 82

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets