JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 83

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 83

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 22, 2020.

Questions

1) 2191 x 804=
2) 9776 x 292=
3) 5634 x 315=
4) 7294 x 669=
5) 9559 x 433=
6) 2305 x 986=
7) 7348 x 420=
8) 5855 x 302=
9) 8465 x 540=
10) 2520 x 515=
11) 4301 x 506=
12) 7315 x 439=
13) 6373 x 796=
14) 2325 x 931=
15) 2209 x 229=
16) 9072 x 168=
17) 6508 x 785=
18) 7329 x 637=
19) 5736 x 482=
20) 4729 x 889=
21) 1002 x 831=
22) 1890 x 543=
23) 9900 x 276=
24) 2713 x 899=
25) 5025 x 345=
26) 6502 x 740=
27) 6535 x 677=
28) 3907 x 322=
29) 7132 x 508=
30) 5940 x 134=
31) 5987 x 422=
32) 1588 x 929=
33) 2879 x 838=
34) 7508 x 187=
35) 1619 x 695=
36) 1126 x 358=
37) 5900 x 830=
38) 9875 x 520=
39) 3063 x 493=
40) 4770 x 919=
41) 1703 x 658=
42) 9418 x 474=
43) 1158 x 949=
44) 7192 x 864=
45) 6495 x 243=
46) 1678 x 814=
47) 9922 x 663=
48) 5766 x 495=
49) 6463 x 893=
50) 2090 x 768=




Answers

1) 2191 * 804 = 1761564 2) 9776 * 292 = 2854592 3) 5634 * 315 = 1774710 4) 7294 * 669 = 4879686 5) 9559 * 433 = 4139047 6) 2305 * 986 = 2272730 7) 7348 * 420 = 3086160 8) 5855 * 302 = 1768210 9) 8465 * 540 = 4571100 10) 2520 * 515 = 1297800 11) 4301 * 506 = 2176306 12) 7315 * 439 = 3211285 13) 6373 * 796 = 5072908 14) 2325 * 931 = 2164575 15) 2209 * 229 = 505861 16) 9072 * 168 = 1524096 17) 6508 * 785 = 5108780 18) 7329 * 637 = 4668573 19) 5736 * 482 = 2764752 20) 4729 * 889 = 4204081 21) 1002 * 831 = 832662 22) 1890 * 543 = 1026270 23) 9900 * 276 = 2732400 24) 2713 * 899 = 2438987 25) 5025 * 345 = 1733625 26) 6502 * 740 = 4811480 27) 6535 * 677 = 4424195 28) 3907 * 322 = 1258054 29) 7132 * 508 = 3623056 30) 5940 * 134 = 795960 31) 5987 * 422 = 2526514 32) 1588 * 929 = 1475252 33) 2879 * 838 = 2412602 34) 7508 * 187 = 1403996 35) 1619 * 695 = 1125205 36) 1126 * 358 = 403108 37) 5900 * 830 = 4897000 38) 9875 * 520 = 5135000 39) 3063 * 493 = 1510059 40) 4770 * 919 = 4383630 41) 1703 * 658 = 1120574 42) 9418 * 474 = 4464132 43) 1158 * 949 = 1098942 44) 7192 * 864 = 6213888 45) 6495 * 243 = 1578285 46) 1678 * 814 = 1365892 47) 9922 * 663 = 6578286 48) 5766 * 495 = 2854170 49) 6463 * 893 = 5771459 50) 2090 * 768 = 1605120

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 83

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 83

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets