JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 85

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 85

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 24, 2020.

Questions

1) 3317 x 385=
2) 5166 x 649=
3) 9237 x 641=
4) 7436 x 224=
5) 3690 x 355=
6) 3232 x 147=
7) 8831 x 627=
8) 8842 x 717=
9) 8671 x 991=
10) 6244 x 202=
11) 1619 x 280=
12) 6814 x 180=
13) 7290 x 601=
14) 4084 x 916=
15) 8054 x 269=
16) 7980 x 289=
17) 9861 x 977=
18) 9579 x 617=
19) 5486 x 544=
20) 6891 x 429=
21) 8095 x 998=
22) 5849 x 122=
23) 4977 x 254=
24) 3299 x 838=
25) 9065 x 595=
26) 7246 x 109=
27) 4687 x 592=
28) 8813 x 159=
29) 8466 x 152=
30) 5589 x 922=
31) 9673 x 258=
32) 5858 x 153=
33) 6216 x 836=
34) 1102 x 739=
35) 8133 x 429=
36) 8617 x 691=
37) 4846 x 264=
38) 3556 x 789=
39) 3329 x 882=
40) 9704 x 329=
41) 8944 x 703=
42) 9002 x 952=
43) 2431 x 601=
44) 6547 x 434=
45) 8303 x 813=
46) 4922 x 252=
47) 6923 x 711=
48) 4627 x 800=
49) 6579 x 741=
50) 2484 x 875=




Answers

1) 3317 * 385 = 1277045 2) 5166 * 649 = 3352734 3) 9237 * 641 = 5920917 4) 7436 * 224 = 1665664 5) 3690 * 355 = 1309950 6) 3232 * 147 = 475104 7) 8831 * 627 = 5537037 8) 8842 * 717 = 6339714 9) 8671 * 991 = 8592961 10) 6244 * 202 = 1261288 11) 1619 * 280 = 453320 12) 6814 * 180 = 1226520 13) 7290 * 601 = 4381290 14) 4084 * 916 = 3740944 15) 8054 * 269 = 2166526 16) 7980 * 289 = 2306220 17) 9861 * 977 = 9634197 18) 9579 * 617 = 5910243 19) 5486 * 544 = 2984384 20) 6891 * 429 = 2956239 21) 8095 * 998 = 8078810 22) 5849 * 122 = 713578 23) 4977 * 254 = 1264158 24) 3299 * 838 = 2764562 25) 9065 * 595 = 5393675 26) 7246 * 109 = 789814 27) 4687 * 592 = 2774704 28) 8813 * 159 = 1401267 29) 8466 * 152 = 1286832 30) 5589 * 922 = 5153058 31) 9673 * 258 = 2495634 32) 5858 * 153 = 896274 33) 6216 * 836 = 5196576 34) 1102 * 739 = 814378 35) 8133 * 429 = 3489057 36) 8617 * 691 = 5954347 37) 4846 * 264 = 1279344 38) 3556 * 789 = 2805684 39) 3329 * 882 = 2936178 40) 9704 * 329 = 3192616 41) 8944 * 703 = 6287632 42) 9002 * 952 = 8569904 43) 2431 * 601 = 1461031 44) 6547 * 434 = 2841398 45) 8303 * 813 = 6750339 46) 4922 * 252 = 1240344 47) 6923 * 711 = 4922253 48) 4627 * 800 = 3701600 49) 6579 * 741 = 4875039 50) 2484 * 875 = 2173500

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 85

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 85

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets