JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 86

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 86

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 25, 2020.

Questions

1) 9450 x 788=
2) 9185 x 201=
3) 5085 x 495=
4) 2608 x 180=
5) 5245 x 223=
6) 9869 x 480=
7) 3081 x 533=
8) 9956 x 739=
9) 5007 x 136=
10) 9425 x 330=
11) 2885 x 707=
12) 1095 x 558=
13) 6905 x 525=
14) 2881 x 791=
15) 1493 x 509=
16) 3601 x 206=
17) 5437 x 382=
18) 9780 x 723=
19) 6456 x 361=
20) 3476 x 912=
21) 9573 x 844=
22) 7042 x 622=
23) 9199 x 972=
24) 6929 x 779=
25) 5360 x 836=
26) 8267 x 110=
27) 7837 x 375=
28) 4423 x 798=
29) 8894 x 275=
30) 3893 x 751=
31) 7462 x 518=
32) 2993 x 383=
33) 1235 x 927=
34) 5957 x 976=
35) 9655 x 911=
36) 7364 x 628=
37) 6689 x 691=
38) 9561 x 316=
39) 3886 x 752=
40) 2580 x 626=
41) 7671 x 776=
42) 6304 x 303=
43) 5939 x 387=
44) 7859 x 798=
45) 3325 x 201=
46) 7574 x 592=
47) 4982 x 164=
48) 9343 x 294=
49) 4918 x 382=
50) 3511 x 428=




Answers

1) 9450 * 788 = 7446600 2) 9185 * 201 = 1846185 3) 5085 * 495 = 2517075 4) 2608 * 180 = 469440 5) 5245 * 223 = 1169635 6) 9869 * 480 = 4737120 7) 3081 * 533 = 1642173 8) 9956 * 739 = 7357484 9) 5007 * 136 = 680952 10) 9425 * 330 = 3110250 11) 2885 * 707 = 2039695 12) 1095 * 558 = 611010 13) 6905 * 525 = 3625125 14) 2881 * 791 = 2278871 15) 1493 * 509 = 759937 16) 3601 * 206 = 741806 17) 5437 * 382 = 2076934 18) 9780 * 723 = 7070940 19) 6456 * 361 = 2330616 20) 3476 * 912 = 3170112 21) 9573 * 844 = 8079612 22) 7042 * 622 = 4380124 23) 9199 * 972 = 8941428 24) 6929 * 779 = 5397691 25) 5360 * 836 = 4480960 26) 8267 * 110 = 909370 27) 7837 * 375 = 2938875 28) 4423 * 798 = 3529554 29) 8894 * 275 = 2445850 30) 3893 * 751 = 2923643 31) 7462 * 518 = 3865316 32) 2993 * 383 = 1146319 33) 1235 * 927 = 1144845 34) 5957 * 976 = 5814032 35) 9655 * 911 = 8795705 36) 7364 * 628 = 4624592 37) 6689 * 691 = 4622099 38) 9561 * 316 = 3021276 39) 3886 * 752 = 2922272 40) 2580 * 626 = 1615080 41) 7671 * 776 = 5952696 42) 6304 * 303 = 1910112 43) 5939 * 387 = 2298393 44) 7859 * 798 = 6271482 45) 3325 * 201 = 668325 46) 7574 * 592 = 4483808 47) 4982 * 164 = 817048 48) 9343 * 294 = 2746842 49) 4918 * 382 = 1878676 50) 3511 * 428 = 1502708

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 86

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 86

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets