JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 87

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 87

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 26, 2020.

Questions

1) 3310 x 429=
2) 2332 x 290=
3) 8950 x 159=
4) 5967 x 840=
5) 7548 x 277=
6) 8994 x 723=
7) 6844 x 603=
8) 9229 x 307=
9) 3742 x 847=
10) 4560 x 433=
11) 4046 x 214=
12) 8988 x 273=
13) 9492 x 538=
14) 1861 x 718=
15) 3298 x 293=
16) 4512 x 776=
17) 3719 x 624=
18) 1932 x 483=
19) 8246 x 935=
20) 9374 x 758=
21) 6788 x 205=
22) 8059 x 400=
23) 7078 x 816=
24) 9729 x 662=
25) 1289 x 571=
26) 1644 x 129=
27) 9206 x 968=
28) 1384 x 904=
29) 8582 x 141=
30) 4892 x 126=
31) 2704 x 313=
32) 2202 x 119=
33) 1401 x 164=
34) 7009 x 368=
35) 5092 x 753=
36) 1815 x 552=
37) 7484 x 495=
38) 4863 x 990=
39) 6969 x 431=
40) 6333 x 891=
41) 4212 x 522=
42) 9395 x 575=
43) 2219 x 185=
44) 3184 x 796=
45) 8126 x 252=
46) 1127 x 489=
47) 4269 x 401=
48) 2945 x 670=
49) 7623 x 300=
50) 3759 x 635=




Answers

1) 3310 * 429 = 1419990 2) 2332 * 290 = 676280 3) 8950 * 159 = 1423050 4) 5967 * 840 = 5012280 5) 7548 * 277 = 2090796 6) 8994 * 723 = 6502662 7) 6844 * 603 = 4126932 8) 9229 * 307 = 2833303 9) 3742 * 847 = 3169474 10) 4560 * 433 = 1974480 11) 4046 * 214 = 865844 12) 8988 * 273 = 2453724 13) 9492 * 538 = 5106696 14) 1861 * 718 = 1336198 15) 3298 * 293 = 966314 16) 4512 * 776 = 3501312 17) 3719 * 624 = 2320656 18) 1932 * 483 = 933156 19) 8246 * 935 = 7710010 20) 9374 * 758 = 7105492 21) 6788 * 205 = 1391540 22) 8059 * 400 = 3223600 23) 7078 * 816 = 5775648 24) 9729 * 662 = 6440598 25) 1289 * 571 = 736019 26) 1644 * 129 = 212076 27) 9206 * 968 = 8911408 28) 1384 * 904 = 1251136 29) 8582 * 141 = 1210062 30) 4892 * 126 = 616392 31) 2704 * 313 = 846352 32) 2202 * 119 = 262038 33) 1401 * 164 = 229764 34) 7009 * 368 = 2579312 35) 5092 * 753 = 3834276 36) 1815 * 552 = 1001880 37) 7484 * 495 = 3704580 38) 4863 * 990 = 4814370 39) 6969 * 431 = 3003639 40) 6333 * 891 = 5642703 41) 4212 * 522 = 2198664 42) 9395 * 575 = 5402125 43) 2219 * 185 = 410515 44) 3184 * 796 = 2534464 45) 8126 * 252 = 2047752 46) 1127 * 489 = 551103 47) 4269 * 401 = 1711869 48) 2945 * 670 = 1973150 49) 7623 * 300 = 2286900 50) 3759 * 635 = 2386965

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 87

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 87

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets