JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 88

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 88

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 27, 2020.

Questions

1) 1117 x 357=
2) 9367 x 523=
3) 6637 x 105=
4) 8070 x 632=
5) 8803 x 417=
6) 5743 x 304=
7) 3794 x 281=
8) 5034 x 666=
9) 9308 x 690=
10) 3840 x 372=
11) 4607 x 612=
12) 1252 x 823=
13) 2059 x 354=
14) 5355 x 346=
15) 6747 x 193=
16) 7130 x 370=
17) 3594 x 869=
18) 8888 x 128=
19) 3870 x 976=
20) 1054 x 203=
21) 1991 x 882=
22) 9160 x 439=
23) 8410 x 414=
24) 5834 x 406=
25) 8461 x 872=
26) 4430 x 420=
27) 9378 x 838=
28) 7570 x 789=
29) 3684 x 887=
30) 6792 x 577=
31) 2783 x 656=
32) 7989 x 836=
33) 2740 x 780=
34) 2449 x 271=
35) 6607 x 561=
36) 1525 x 375=
37) 8635 x 638=
38) 8967 x 881=
39) 5653 x 726=
40) 9040 x 927=
41) 9792 x 486=
42) 4924 x 114=
43) 2944 x 962=
44) 4266 x 805=
45) 2128 x 281=
46) 9249 x 289=
47) 1207 x 147=
48) 9931 x 293=
49) 1014 x 394=
50) 5992 x 670=




Answers

1) 1117 * 357 = 398769 2) 9367 * 523 = 4898941 3) 6637 * 105 = 696885 4) 8070 * 632 = 5100240 5) 8803 * 417 = 3670851 6) 5743 * 304 = 1745872 7) 3794 * 281 = 1066114 8) 5034 * 666 = 3352644 9) 9308 * 690 = 6422520 10) 3840 * 372 = 1428480 11) 4607 * 612 = 2819484 12) 1252 * 823 = 1030396 13) 2059 * 354 = 728886 14) 5355 * 346 = 1852830 15) 6747 * 193 = 1302171 16) 7130 * 370 = 2638100 17) 3594 * 869 = 3123186 18) 8888 * 128 = 1137664 19) 3870 * 976 = 3777120 20) 1054 * 203 = 213962 21) 1991 * 882 = 1756062 22) 9160 * 439 = 4021240 23) 8410 * 414 = 3481740 24) 5834 * 406 = 2368604 25) 8461 * 872 = 7377992 26) 4430 * 420 = 1860600 27) 9378 * 838 = 7858764 28) 7570 * 789 = 5972730 29) 3684 * 887 = 3267708 30) 6792 * 577 = 3918984 31) 2783 * 656 = 1825648 32) 7989 * 836 = 6678804 33) 2740 * 780 = 2137200 34) 2449 * 271 = 663679 35) 6607 * 561 = 3706527 36) 1525 * 375 = 571875 37) 8635 * 638 = 5509130 38) 8967 * 881 = 7899927 39) 5653 * 726 = 4104078 40) 9040 * 927 = 8380080 41) 9792 * 486 = 4758912 42) 4924 * 114 = 561336 43) 2944 * 962 = 2832128 44) 4266 * 805 = 3434130 45) 2128 * 281 = 597968 46) 9249 * 289 = 2672961 47) 1207 * 147 = 177429 48) 9931 * 293 = 2909783 49) 1014 * 394 = 399516 50) 5992 * 670 = 4014640

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 88

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 88

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets