JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 28, 2020.

Questions

1) 1241 x 382=
2) 3825 x 879=
3) 6396 x 752=
4) 6908 x 399=
5) 3607 x 748=
6) 5170 x 201=
7) 4152 x 443=
8) 7001 x 518=
9) 1257 x 739=
10) 7333 x 589=
11) 9307 x 681=
12) 8749 x 987=
13) 4368 x 183=
14) 4555 x 595=
15) 9704 x 879=
16) 5110 x 232=
17) 3579 x 418=
18) 7578 x 542=
19) 3245 x 155=
20) 5009 x 422=
21) 9664 x 769=
22) 3586 x 105=
23) 1633 x 766=
24) 9176 x 639=
25) 2629 x 512=
26) 8431 x 326=
27) 2814 x 706=
28) 2121 x 261=
29) 1655 x 205=
30) 9642 x 177=
31) 2231 x 837=
32) 9147 x 426=
33) 8662 x 491=
34) 1360 x 924=
35) 7784 x 241=
36) 3737 x 900=
37) 3912 x 419=
38) 3636 x 450=
39) 1621 x 184=
40) 1561 x 795=
41) 6806 x 109=
42) 2631 x 451=
43) 2980 x 715=
44) 1575 x 282=
45) 3513 x 292=
46) 3043 x 684=
47) 6342 x 995=
48) 3802 x 414=
49) 6441 x 976=
50) 2671 x 898=




Answers

1) 1241 * 382 = 474062 2) 3825 * 879 = 3362175 3) 6396 * 752 = 4809792 4) 6908 * 399 = 2756292 5) 3607 * 748 = 2698036 6) 5170 * 201 = 1039170 7) 4152 * 443 = 1839336 8) 7001 * 518 = 3626518 9) 1257 * 739 = 928923 10) 7333 * 589 = 4319137 11) 9307 * 681 = 6338067 12) 8749 * 987 = 8635263 13) 4368 * 183 = 799344 14) 4555 * 595 = 2710225 15) 9704 * 879 = 8529816 16) 5110 * 232 = 1185520 17) 3579 * 418 = 1496022 18) 7578 * 542 = 4107276 19) 3245 * 155 = 502975 20) 5009 * 422 = 2113798 21) 9664 * 769 = 7431616 22) 3586 * 105 = 376530 23) 1633 * 766 = 1250878 24) 9176 * 639 = 5863464 25) 2629 * 512 = 1346048 26) 8431 * 326 = 2748506 27) 2814 * 706 = 1986684 28) 2121 * 261 = 553581 29) 1655 * 205 = 339275 30) 9642 * 177 = 1706634 31) 2231 * 837 = 1867347 32) 9147 * 426 = 3896622 33) 8662 * 491 = 4253042 34) 1360 * 924 = 1256640 35) 7784 * 241 = 1875944 36) 3737 * 900 = 3363300 37) 3912 * 419 = 1639128 38) 3636 * 450 = 1636200 39) 1621 * 184 = 298264 40) 1561 * 795 = 1240995 41) 6806 * 109 = 741854 42) 2631 * 451 = 1186581 43) 2980 * 715 = 2130700 44) 1575 * 282 = 444150 45) 3513 * 292 = 1025796 46) 3043 * 684 = 2081412 47) 6342 * 995 = 6310290 48) 3802 * 414 = 1574028 49) 6441 * 976 = 6286416 50) 2671 * 898 = 2398558

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets