JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 9

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 9

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 8827 x 682=
2) 7377 x 263=
3) 8280 x 375=
4) 5222 x 530=
5) 4260 x 463=
6) 4229 x 957=
7) 4758 x 819=
8) 9858 x 656=
9) 9635 x 681=
10) 6395 x 245=
11) 9782 x 576=
12) 6441 x 629=
13) 1765 x 538=
14) 2939 x 996=
15) 3115 x 931=
16) 3391 x 187=
17) 5440 x 629=
18) 7048 x 607=
19) 1085 x 667=
20) 8420 x 908=
21) 4674 x 884=
22) 3950 x 728=
23) 7386 x 379=
24) 6567 x 884=
25) 5118 x 921=
26) 8966 x 871=
27) 9044 x 773=
28) 9157 x 99=
29) 7142 x 303=
30) 7411 x 408=
31) 8462 x 497=
32) 7066 x 517=
33) 3454 x 106=
34) 8543 x 210=
35) 6139 x 564=
36) 2218 x 681=
37) 6142 x 485=
38) 4525 x 261=
39) 5164 x 549=
40) 2565 x 851=
41) 5268 x 839=
42) 3768 x 989=
43) 6083 x 659=
44) 4387 x 272=
45) 7734 x 696=
46) 5671 x 940=
47) 9968 x 128=
48) 3007 x 242=
49) 1178 x 801=
50) 8577 x 152=




Answers

1) 8827 * 682 = 6020014 2) 7377 * 263 = 1940151 3) 8280 * 375 = 3105000 4) 5222 * 530 = 2767660 5) 4260 * 463 = 1972380 6) 4229 * 957 = 4047153 7) 4758 * 819 = 3896802 8) 9858 * 656 = 6466848 9) 9635 * 681 = 6561435 10) 6395 * 245 = 1566775 11) 9782 * 576 = 5634432 12) 6441 * 629 = 4051389 13) 1765 * 538 = 949570 14) 2939 * 996 = 2927244 15) 3115 * 931 = 2900065 16) 3391 * 187 = 634117 17) 5440 * 629 = 3421760 18) 7048 * 607 = 4278136 19) 1085 * 667 = 723695 20) 8420 * 908 = 7645360 21) 4674 * 884 = 4131816 22) 3950 * 728 = 2875600 23) 7386 * 379 = 2799294 24) 6567 * 884 = 5805228 25) 5118 * 921 = 4713678 26) 8966 * 871 = 7809386 27) 9044 * 773 = 6991012 28) 9157 * 99 = 906543 29) 7142 * 303 = 2164026 30) 7411 * 408 = 3023688 31) 8462 * 497 = 4205614 32) 7066 * 517 = 3653122 33) 3454 * 106 = 366124 34) 8543 * 210 = 1794030 35) 6139 * 564 = 3462396 36) 2218 * 681 = 1510458 37) 6142 * 485 = 2978870 38) 4525 * 261 = 1181025 39) 5164 * 549 = 2835036 40) 2565 * 851 = 2182815 41) 5268 * 839 = 4419852 42) 3768 * 989 = 3726552 43) 6083 * 659 = 4008697 44) 4387 * 272 = 1193264 45) 7734 * 696 = 5382864 46) 5671 * 940 = 5330740 47) 9968 * 128 = 1275904 48) 3007 * 242 = 727694 49) 1178 * 801 = 943578 50) 8577 * 152 = 1303704

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 9

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 9

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets