JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 90

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 90

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 29, 2020.

Questions

1) 1574 x 919=
2) 6817 x 589=
3) 3987 x 445=
4) 6782 x 826=
5) 1970 x 498=
6) 9907 x 380=
7) 3675 x 699=
8) 3702 x 345=
9) 9361 x 862=
10) 8241 x 795=
11) 4979 x 313=
12) 5362 x 262=
13) 1368 x 670=
14) 2188 x 536=
15) 2315 x 768=
16) 3486 x 905=
17) 8250 x 581=
18) 2865 x 960=
19) 4963 x 387=
20) 1296 x 908=
21) 6528 x 870=
22) 7190 x 611=
23) 5283 x 122=
24) 4350 x 240=
25) 9837 x 505=
26) 2820 x 920=
27) 9079 x 525=
28) 5769 x 874=
29) 2350 x 825=
30) 5058 x 786=
31) 8094 x 595=
32) 7931 x 937=
33) 5772 x 213=
34) 6226 x 302=
35) 6630 x 927=
36) 7864 x 823=
37) 8515 x 944=
38) 1500 x 205=
39) 9799 x 539=
40) 1050 x 474=
41) 2206 x 132=
42) 6175 x 354=
43) 9638 x 780=
44) 6948 x 596=
45) 3877 x 252=
46) 1618 x 285=
47) 1976 x 676=
48) 1267 x 446=
49) 8409 x 206=
50) 9146 x 144=




Answers

1) 1574 * 919 = 1446506 2) 6817 * 589 = 4015213 3) 3987 * 445 = 1774215 4) 6782 * 826 = 5601932 5) 1970 * 498 = 981060 6) 9907 * 380 = 3764660 7) 3675 * 699 = 2568825 8) 3702 * 345 = 1277190 9) 9361 * 862 = 8069182 10) 8241 * 795 = 6551595 11) 4979 * 313 = 1558427 12) 5362 * 262 = 1404844 13) 1368 * 670 = 916560 14) 2188 * 536 = 1172768 15) 2315 * 768 = 1777920 16) 3486 * 905 = 3154830 17) 8250 * 581 = 4793250 18) 2865 * 960 = 2750400 19) 4963 * 387 = 1920681 20) 1296 * 908 = 1176768 21) 6528 * 870 = 5679360 22) 7190 * 611 = 4393090 23) 5283 * 122 = 644526 24) 4350 * 240 = 1044000 25) 9837 * 505 = 4967685 26) 2820 * 920 = 2594400 27) 9079 * 525 = 4766475 28) 5769 * 874 = 5042106 29) 2350 * 825 = 1938750 30) 5058 * 786 = 3975588 31) 8094 * 595 = 4815930 32) 7931 * 937 = 7431347 33) 5772 * 213 = 1229436 34) 6226 * 302 = 1880252 35) 6630 * 927 = 6146010 36) 7864 * 823 = 6472072 37) 8515 * 944 = 8038160 38) 1500 * 205 = 307500 39) 9799 * 539 = 5281661 40) 1050 * 474 = 497700 41) 2206 * 132 = 291192 42) 6175 * 354 = 2185950 43) 9638 * 780 = 7517640 44) 6948 * 596 = 4141008 45) 3877 * 252 = 977004 46) 1618 * 285 = 461130 47) 1976 * 676 = 1335776 48) 1267 * 446 = 565082 49) 8409 * 206 = 1732254 50) 9146 * 144 = 1317024

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 90

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 90

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets