JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 30, 2020.

Questions

1) 9773 x 450=
2) 3176 x 297=
3) 4420 x 558=
4) 5050 x 203=
5) 5729 x 668=
6) 4361 x 975=
7) 1083 x 317=
8) 7921 x 220=
9) 5217 x 283=
10) 5479 x 895=
11) 7497 x 457=
12) 5712 x 995=
13) 9740 x 719=
14) 6513 x 834=
15) 7868 x 692=
16) 9581 x 968=
17) 2329 x 918=
18) 6423 x 804=
19) 4869 x 985=
20) 5775 x 816=
21) 4070 x 412=
22) 2550 x 204=
23) 1638 x 398=
24) 1957 x 739=
25) 3999 x 569=
26) 1903 x 821=
27) 6379 x 414=
28) 6521 x 524=
29) 2371 x 380=
30) 3646 x 836=
31) 5260 x 376=
32) 9008 x 640=
33) 5531 x 781=
34) 8454 x 430=
35) 2039 x 838=
36) 5074 x 884=
37) 8520 x 490=
38) 7225 x 629=
39) 5522 x 948=
40) 1699 x 566=
41) 7506 x 581=
42) 4845 x 828=
43) 1828 x 181=
44) 6851 x 535=
45) 1816 x 991=
46) 1874 x 894=
47) 5133 x 988=
48) 2334 x 517=
49) 1170 x 553=
50) 3383 x 515=




Answers

1) 9773 * 450 = 4397850 2) 3176 * 297 = 943272 3) 4420 * 558 = 2466360 4) 5050 * 203 = 1025150 5) 5729 * 668 = 3826972 6) 4361 * 975 = 4251975 7) 1083 * 317 = 343311 8) 7921 * 220 = 1742620 9) 5217 * 283 = 1476411 10) 5479 * 895 = 4903705 11) 7497 * 457 = 3426129 12) 5712 * 995 = 5683440 13) 9740 * 719 = 7003060 14) 6513 * 834 = 5431842 15) 7868 * 692 = 5444656 16) 9581 * 968 = 9274408 17) 2329 * 918 = 2138022 18) 6423 * 804 = 5164092 19) 4869 * 985 = 4795965 20) 5775 * 816 = 4712400 21) 4070 * 412 = 1676840 22) 2550 * 204 = 520200 23) 1638 * 398 = 651924 24) 1957 * 739 = 1446223 25) 3999 * 569 = 2275431 26) 1903 * 821 = 1562363 27) 6379 * 414 = 2640906 28) 6521 * 524 = 3417004 29) 2371 * 380 = 900980 30) 3646 * 836 = 3048056 31) 5260 * 376 = 1977760 32) 9008 * 640 = 5765120 33) 5531 * 781 = 4319711 34) 8454 * 430 = 3635220 35) 2039 * 838 = 1708682 36) 5074 * 884 = 4485416 37) 8520 * 490 = 4174800 38) 7225 * 629 = 4544525 39) 5522 * 948 = 5234856 40) 1699 * 566 = 961634 41) 7506 * 581 = 4360986 42) 4845 * 828 = 4011660 43) 1828 * 181 = 330868 44) 6851 * 535 = 3665285 45) 1816 * 991 = 1799656 46) 1874 * 894 = 1675356 47) 5133 * 988 = 5071404 48) 2334 * 517 = 1206678 49) 1170 * 553 = 647010 50) 3383 * 515 = 1742245

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets