JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 93

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 93

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 2, 2020.

Questions

1) 8438 x 983=
2) 5910 x 727=
3) 9086 x 770=
4) 2247 x 957=
5) 5876 x 934=
6) 2513 x 411=
7) 9311 x 951=
8) 9055 x 535=
9) 6439 x 863=
10) 9649 x 361=
11) 5409 x 326=
12) 9735 x 767=
13) 5340 x 478=
14) 5215 x 410=
15) 5275 x 436=
16) 4193 x 282=
17) 1631 x 746=
18) 3936 x 100=
19) 1399 x 497=
20) 6282 x 217=
21) 5205 x 286=
22) 7417 x 566=
23) 2999 x 636=
24) 7124 x 949=
25) 4287 x 791=
26) 2041 x 345=
27) 9711 x 312=
28) 3550 x 898=
29) 3219 x 865=
30) 3674 x 333=
31) 3452 x 411=
32) 7493 x 240=
33) 4308 x 801=
34) 1827 x 230=
35) 8391 x 635=
36) 1429 x 128=
37) 5645 x 253=
38) 5959 x 923=
39) 9136 x 419=
40) 3935 x 361=
41) 5697 x 468=
42) 7513 x 773=
43) 1477 x 317=
44) 4222 x 929=
45) 6987 x 537=
46) 9830 x 748=
47) 2337 x 768=
48) 1045 x 436=
49) 6766 x 385=
50) 9610 x 718=




Answers

1) 8438 * 983 = 8294554 2) 5910 * 727 = 4296570 3) 9086 * 770 = 6996220 4) 2247 * 957 = 2150379 5) 5876 * 934 = 5488184 6) 2513 * 411 = 1032843 7) 9311 * 951 = 8854761 8) 9055 * 535 = 4844425 9) 6439 * 863 = 5556857 10) 9649 * 361 = 3483289 11) 5409 * 326 = 1763334 12) 9735 * 767 = 7466745 13) 5340 * 478 = 2552520 14) 5215 * 410 = 2138150 15) 5275 * 436 = 2299900 16) 4193 * 282 = 1182426 17) 1631 * 746 = 1216726 18) 3936 * 100 = 393600 19) 1399 * 497 = 695303 20) 6282 * 217 = 1363194 21) 5205 * 286 = 1488630 22) 7417 * 566 = 4198022 23) 2999 * 636 = 1907364 24) 7124 * 949 = 6760676 25) 4287 * 791 = 3391017 26) 2041 * 345 = 704145 27) 9711 * 312 = 3029832 28) 3550 * 898 = 3187900 29) 3219 * 865 = 2784435 30) 3674 * 333 = 1223442 31) 3452 * 411 = 1418772 32) 7493 * 240 = 1798320 33) 4308 * 801 = 3450708 34) 1827 * 230 = 420210 35) 8391 * 635 = 5328285 36) 1429 * 128 = 182912 37) 5645 * 253 = 1428185 38) 5959 * 923 = 5500157 39) 9136 * 419 = 3827984 40) 3935 * 361 = 1420535 41) 5697 * 468 = 2666196 42) 7513 * 773 = 5807549 43) 1477 * 317 = 468209 44) 4222 * 929 = 3922238 45) 6987 * 537 = 3752019 46) 9830 * 748 = 7352840 47) 2337 * 768 = 1794816 48) 1045 * 436 = 455620 49) 6766 * 385 = 2604910 50) 9610 * 718 = 6899980

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 93

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 93

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets