JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 6456 x 614=
2) 5596 x 395=
3) 5546 x 696=
4) 8628 x 330=
5) 5406 x 773=
6) 1634 x 576=
7) 2844 x 828=
8) 5381 x 968=
9) 5851 x 187=
10) 6891 x 786=
11) 8122 x 478=
12) 3624 x 723=
13) 7615 x 993=
14) 8518 x 520=
15) 3266 x 577=
16) 2048 x 512=
17) 9756 x 505=
18) 2584 x 765=
19) 2996 x 266=
20) 9957 x 159=
21) 5022 x 839=
22) 3981 x 744=
23) 8208 x 116=
24) 1140 x 960=
25) 3349 x 238=
26) 4828 x 306=
27) 6845 x 526=
28) 6366 x 923=
29) 8524 x 416=
30) 3215 x 614=
31) 2901 x 403=
32) 3471 x 618=
33) 3713 x 868=
34) 4406 x 397=
35) 6380 x 522=
36) 9390 x 553=
37) 7164 x 901=
38) 7002 x 650=
39) 9677 x 908=
40) 8467 x 856=
41) 9515 x 427=
42) 8077 x 212=
43) 3416 x 654=
44) 4130 x 254=
45) 1061 x 320=
46) 7974 x 381=
47) 5378 x 843=
48) 6206 x 423=
49) 7372 x 621=
50) 5552 x 440=




Answers

1) 6456 * 614 = 3963984 2) 5596 * 395 = 2210420 3) 5546 * 696 = 3860016 4) 8628 * 330 = 2847240 5) 5406 * 773 = 4178838 6) 1634 * 576 = 941184 7) 2844 * 828 = 2354832 8) 5381 * 968 = 5208808 9) 5851 * 187 = 1094137 10) 6891 * 786 = 5416326 11) 8122 * 478 = 3882316 12) 3624 * 723 = 2620152 13) 7615 * 993 = 7561695 14) 8518 * 520 = 4429360 15) 3266 * 577 = 1884482 16) 2048 * 512 = 1048576 17) 9756 * 505 = 4926780 18) 2584 * 765 = 1976760 19) 2996 * 266 = 796936 20) 9957 * 159 = 1583163 21) 5022 * 839 = 4213458 22) 3981 * 744 = 2961864 23) 8208 * 116 = 952128 24) 1140 * 960 = 1094400 25) 3349 * 238 = 797062 26) 4828 * 306 = 1477368 27) 6845 * 526 = 3600470 28) 6366 * 923 = 5875818 29) 8524 * 416 = 3545984 30) 3215 * 614 = 1974010 31) 2901 * 403 = 1169103 32) 3471 * 618 = 2145078 33) 3713 * 868 = 3222884 34) 4406 * 397 = 1749182 35) 6380 * 522 = 3330360 36) 9390 * 553 = 5192670 37) 7164 * 901 = 6454764 38) 7002 * 650 = 4551300 39) 9677 * 908 = 8786716 40) 8467 * 856 = 7247752 41) 9515 * 427 = 4062905 42) 8077 * 212 = 1712324 43) 3416 * 654 = 2234064 44) 4130 * 254 = 1049020 45) 1061 * 320 = 339520 46) 7974 * 381 = 3038094 47) 5378 * 843 = 4533654 48) 6206 * 423 = 2625138 49) 7372 * 621 = 4578012 50) 5552 * 440 = 2442880

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets