JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 95

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 95

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 2205 x 532=
2) 9879 x 357=
3) 9420 x 428=
4) 4329 x 713=
5) 2513 x 247=
6) 5138 x 303=
7) 6993 x 256=
8) 8436 x 665=
9) 9970 x 945=
10) 9462 x 841=
11) 3527 x 274=
12) 3734 x 270=
13) 2629 x 560=
14) 4725 x 795=
15) 5750 x 556=
16) 4367 x 544=
17) 1377 x 260=
18) 5055 x 376=
19) 3169 x 429=
20) 3194 x 390=
21) 5315 x 436=
22) 4060 x 647=
23) 4774 x 924=
24) 6951 x 732=
25) 1712 x 532=
26) 5132 x 168=
27) 5157 x 226=
28) 7620 x 782=
29) 4119 x 661=
30) 5087 x 668=
31) 9514 x 604=
32) 8472 x 169=
33) 9234 x 904=
34) 3069 x 271=
35) 5571 x 946=
36) 4992 x 727=
37) 6114 x 660=
38) 4499 x 729=
39) 6685 x 137=
40) 6660 x 603=
41) 9770 x 182=
42) 1776 x 218=
43) 7224 x 878=
44) 1738 x 547=
45) 7259 x 261=
46) 8804 x 582=
47) 2328 x 246=
48) 9923 x 483=
49) 2359 x 123=
50) 4513 x 308=




Answers

1) 2205 * 532 = 1173060 2) 9879 * 357 = 3526803 3) 9420 * 428 = 4031760 4) 4329 * 713 = 3086577 5) 2513 * 247 = 620711 6) 5138 * 303 = 1556814 7) 6993 * 256 = 1790208 8) 8436 * 665 = 5609940 9) 9970 * 945 = 9421650 10) 9462 * 841 = 7957542 11) 3527 * 274 = 966398 12) 3734 * 270 = 1008180 13) 2629 * 560 = 1472240 14) 4725 * 795 = 3756375 15) 5750 * 556 = 3197000 16) 4367 * 544 = 2375648 17) 1377 * 260 = 358020 18) 5055 * 376 = 1900680 19) 3169 * 429 = 1359501 20) 3194 * 390 = 1245660 21) 5315 * 436 = 2317340 22) 4060 * 647 = 2626820 23) 4774 * 924 = 4411176 24) 6951 * 732 = 5088132 25) 1712 * 532 = 910784 26) 5132 * 168 = 862176 27) 5157 * 226 = 1165482 28) 7620 * 782 = 5958840 29) 4119 * 661 = 2722659 30) 5087 * 668 = 3398116 31) 9514 * 604 = 5746456 32) 8472 * 169 = 1431768 33) 9234 * 904 = 8347536 34) 3069 * 271 = 831699 35) 5571 * 946 = 5270166 36) 4992 * 727 = 3629184 37) 6114 * 660 = 4035240 38) 4499 * 729 = 3279771 39) 6685 * 137 = 915845 40) 6660 * 603 = 4015980 41) 9770 * 182 = 1778140 42) 1776 * 218 = 387168 43) 7224 * 878 = 6342672 44) 1738 * 547 = 950686 45) 7259 * 261 = 1894599 46) 8804 * 582 = 5123928 47) 2328 * 246 = 572688 48) 9923 * 483 = 4792809 49) 2359 * 123 = 290157 50) 4513 * 308 = 1390004

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 95

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 95

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets