JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 96

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 96

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 5, 2020.

Questions

1) 9268 x 847=
2) 4826 x 164=
3) 1883 x 99=
4) 8638 x 385=
5) 4347 x 562=
6) 2312 x 596=
7) 1255 x 734=
8) 4103 x 421=
9) 3036 x 183=
10) 2874 x 593=
11) 2968 x 929=
12) 9863 x 338=
13) 8197 x 724=
14) 4263 x 305=
15) 4616 x 301=
16) 7462 x 304=
17) 1799 x 408=
18) 7504 x 134=
19) 6780 x 201=
20) 4734 x 242=
21) 7701 x 703=
22) 6036 x 650=
23) 7996 x 540=
24) 8176 x 613=
25) 7857 x 441=
26) 6783 x 143=
27) 1382 x 842=
28) 1951 x 584=
29) 8217 x 152=
30) 6822 x 551=
31) 8481 x 569=
32) 6006 x 834=
33) 7434 x 758=
34) 3226 x 686=
35) 7939 x 626=
36) 1210 x 561=
37) 7593 x 720=
38) 6221 x 641=
39) 5691 x 158=
40) 2616 x 912=
41) 6099 x 329=
42) 9509 x 784=
43) 6698 x 597=
44) 6972 x 652=
45) 1366 x 543=
46) 9672 x 351=
47) 7747 x 707=
48) 3891 x 885=
49) 9433 x 178=
50) 3452 x 527=




Answers

1) 9268 * 847 = 7849996 2) 4826 * 164 = 791464 3) 1883 * 99 = 186417 4) 8638 * 385 = 3325630 5) 4347 * 562 = 2443014 6) 2312 * 596 = 1377952 7) 1255 * 734 = 921170 8) 4103 * 421 = 1727363 9) 3036 * 183 = 555588 10) 2874 * 593 = 1704282 11) 2968 * 929 = 2757272 12) 9863 * 338 = 3333694 13) 8197 * 724 = 5934628 14) 4263 * 305 = 1300215 15) 4616 * 301 = 1389416 16) 7462 * 304 = 2268448 17) 1799 * 408 = 733992 18) 7504 * 134 = 1005536 19) 6780 * 201 = 1362780 20) 4734 * 242 = 1145628 21) 7701 * 703 = 5413803 22) 6036 * 650 = 3923400 23) 7996 * 540 = 4317840 24) 8176 * 613 = 5011888 25) 7857 * 441 = 3464937 26) 6783 * 143 = 969969 27) 1382 * 842 = 1163644 28) 1951 * 584 = 1139384 29) 8217 * 152 = 1248984 30) 6822 * 551 = 3758922 31) 8481 * 569 = 4825689 32) 6006 * 834 = 5009004 33) 7434 * 758 = 5634972 34) 3226 * 686 = 2213036 35) 7939 * 626 = 4969814 36) 1210 * 561 = 678810 37) 7593 * 720 = 5466960 38) 6221 * 641 = 3987661 39) 5691 * 158 = 899178 40) 2616 * 912 = 2385792 41) 6099 * 329 = 2006571 42) 9509 * 784 = 7455056 43) 6698 * 597 = 3998706 44) 6972 * 652 = 4545744 45) 1366 * 543 = 741738 46) 9672 * 351 = 3394872 47) 7747 * 707 = 5477129 48) 3891 * 885 = 3443535 49) 9433 * 178 = 1679074 50) 3452 * 527 = 1819204

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 96

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 96

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets