JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 97

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 97

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 6, 2020.

Questions

1) 1252 x 591=
2) 1848 x 683=
3) 9695 x 592=
4) 6711 x 839=
5) 9503 x 646=
6) 1087 x 983=
7) 7672 x 744=
8) 5380 x 853=
9) 1510 x 995=
10) 8032 x 840=
11) 6083 x 635=
12) 2115 x 961=
13) 8044 x 703=
14) 7141 x 252=
15) 9870 x 313=
16) 3055 x 483=
17) 1124 x 392=
18) 6160 x 253=
19) 2922 x 735=
20) 6352 x 532=
21) 6302 x 806=
22) 5582 x 706=
23) 3261 x 105=
24) 5657 x 672=
25) 7599 x 753=
26) 2966 x 865=
27) 2875 x 695=
28) 8354 x 947=
29) 9916 x 164=
30) 4894 x 984=
31) 3578 x 261=
32) 2058 x 227=
33) 2263 x 828=
34) 5886 x 530=
35) 9578 x 215=
36) 7164 x 738=
37) 2229 x 406=
38) 6602 x 945=
39) 2026 x 407=
40) 8122 x 658=
41) 4012 x 423=
42) 7978 x 239=
43) 1761 x 861=
44) 8364 x 739=
45) 9540 x 594=
46) 3885 x 458=
47) 9549 x 728=
48) 8244 x 247=
49) 2635 x 912=
50) 8653 x 947=




Answers

1) 1252 * 591 = 739932 2) 1848 * 683 = 1262184 3) 9695 * 592 = 5739440 4) 6711 * 839 = 5630529 5) 9503 * 646 = 6138938 6) 1087 * 983 = 1068521 7) 7672 * 744 = 5707968 8) 5380 * 853 = 4589140 9) 1510 * 995 = 1502450 10) 8032 * 840 = 6746880 11) 6083 * 635 = 3862705 12) 2115 * 961 = 2032515 13) 8044 * 703 = 5654932 14) 7141 * 252 = 1799532 15) 9870 * 313 = 3089310 16) 3055 * 483 = 1475565 17) 1124 * 392 = 440608 18) 6160 * 253 = 1558480 19) 2922 * 735 = 2147670 20) 6352 * 532 = 3379264 21) 6302 * 806 = 5079412 22) 5582 * 706 = 3940892 23) 3261 * 105 = 342405 24) 5657 * 672 = 3801504 25) 7599 * 753 = 5722047 26) 2966 * 865 = 2565590 27) 2875 * 695 = 1998125 28) 8354 * 947 = 7911238 29) 9916 * 164 = 1626224 30) 4894 * 984 = 4815696 31) 3578 * 261 = 933858 32) 2058 * 227 = 467166 33) 2263 * 828 = 1873764 34) 5886 * 530 = 3119580 35) 9578 * 215 = 2059270 36) 7164 * 738 = 5287032 37) 2229 * 406 = 904974 38) 6602 * 945 = 6238890 39) 2026 * 407 = 824582 40) 8122 * 658 = 5344276 41) 4012 * 423 = 1697076 42) 7978 * 239 = 1906742 43) 1761 * 861 = 1516221 44) 8364 * 739 = 6180996 45) 9540 * 594 = 5666760 46) 3885 * 458 = 1779330 47) 9549 * 728 = 6951672 48) 8244 * 247 = 2036268 49) 2635 * 912 = 2403120 50) 8653 * 947 = 8194391

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 97

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 97

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets