JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 98

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 98

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 7, 2020.

Questions

1) 8501 x 286=
2) 3322 x 694=
3) 7853 x 600=
4) 3796 x 255=
5) 6877 x 818=
6) 7773 x 978=
7) 6683 x 963=
8) 9293 x 136=
9) 3523 x 136=
10) 7911 x 573=
11) 9823 x 606=
12) 5838 x 454=
13) 1611 x 399=
14) 2731 x 876=
15) 1507 x 429=
16) 5065 x 574=
17) 3640 x 187=
18) 4213 x 472=
19) 7742 x 192=
20) 8069 x 123=
21) 8225 x 155=
22) 3839 x 387=
23) 2110 x 453=
24) 9051 x 907=
25) 9867 x 638=
26) 1095 x 599=
27) 2999 x 814=
28) 5051 x 962=
29) 7238 x 324=
30) 5691 x 551=
31) 4630 x 308=
32) 2062 x 898=
33) 8889 x 938=
34) 9108 x 251=
35) 3729 x 764=
36) 2345 x 361=
37) 1060 x 541=
38) 4102 x 321=
39) 1353 x 499=
40) 6350 x 910=
41) 1452 x 873=
42) 3160 x 128=
43) 6067 x 536=
44) 2323 x 161=
45) 8347 x 821=
46) 8478 x 987=
47) 6749 x 806=
48) 2625 x 251=
49) 7708 x 544=
50) 2612 x 559=




Answers

1) 8501 * 286 = 2431286 2) 3322 * 694 = 2305468 3) 7853 * 600 = 4711800 4) 3796 * 255 = 967980 5) 6877 * 818 = 5625386 6) 7773 * 978 = 7601994 7) 6683 * 963 = 6435729 8) 9293 * 136 = 1263848 9) 3523 * 136 = 479128 10) 7911 * 573 = 4533003 11) 9823 * 606 = 5952738 12) 5838 * 454 = 2650452 13) 1611 * 399 = 642789 14) 2731 * 876 = 2392356 15) 1507 * 429 = 646503 16) 5065 * 574 = 2907310 17) 3640 * 187 = 680680 18) 4213 * 472 = 1988536 19) 7742 * 192 = 1486464 20) 8069 * 123 = 992487 21) 8225 * 155 = 1274875 22) 3839 * 387 = 1485693 23) 2110 * 453 = 955830 24) 9051 * 907 = 8209257 25) 9867 * 638 = 6295146 26) 1095 * 599 = 655905 27) 2999 * 814 = 2441186 28) 5051 * 962 = 4859062 29) 7238 * 324 = 2345112 30) 5691 * 551 = 3135741 31) 4630 * 308 = 1426040 32) 2062 * 898 = 1851676 33) 8889 * 938 = 8337882 34) 9108 * 251 = 2286108 35) 3729 * 764 = 2848956 36) 2345 * 361 = 846545 37) 1060 * 541 = 573460 38) 4102 * 321 = 1316742 39) 1353 * 499 = 675147 40) 6350 * 910 = 5778500 41) 1452 * 873 = 1267596 42) 3160 * 128 = 404480 43) 6067 * 536 = 3251912 44) 2323 * 161 = 374003 45) 8347 * 821 = 6852887 46) 8478 * 987 = 8367786 47) 6749 * 806 = 5439694 48) 2625 * 251 = 658875 49) 7708 * 544 = 4193152 50) 2612 * 559 = 1460108

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 98

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 98

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets