JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 99

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 99

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 5994 x 394=
2) 2243 x 730=
3) 5549 x 233=
4) 3238 x 323=
5) 7829 x 764=
6) 5578 x 794=
7) 9917 x 165=
8) 5173 x 757=
9) 5297 x 608=
10) 3926 x 253=
11) 5332 x 487=
12) 1664 x 476=
13) 7164 x 725=
14) 9961 x 355=
15) 5895 x 354=
16) 2363 x 432=
17) 3375 x 634=
18) 5864 x 673=
19) 9884 x 841=
20) 5951 x 879=
21) 9057 x 179=
22) 8794 x 186=
23) 9453 x 535=
24) 4089 x 629=
25) 2092 x 874=
26) 2262 x 276=
27) 5808 x 489=
28) 2015 x 410=
29) 9850 x 724=
30) 4275 x 327=
31) 6957 x 146=
32) 4737 x 750=
33) 8383 x 606=
34) 7540 x 405=
35) 8357 x 677=
36) 2082 x 880=
37) 7182 x 187=
38) 4320 x 139=
39) 8256 x 280=
40) 7567 x 979=
41) 8461 x 790=
42) 3712 x 208=
43) 8642 x 594=
44) 2887 x 844=
45) 6738 x 875=
46) 7624 x 433=
47) 6765 x 589=
48) 3582 x 804=
49) 3751 x 654=
50) 5798 x 521=




Answers

1) 5994 * 394 = 2361636 2) 2243 * 730 = 1637390 3) 5549 * 233 = 1292917 4) 3238 * 323 = 1045874 5) 7829 * 764 = 5981356 6) 5578 * 794 = 4428932 7) 9917 * 165 = 1636305 8) 5173 * 757 = 3915961 9) 5297 * 608 = 3220576 10) 3926 * 253 = 993278 11) 5332 * 487 = 2596684 12) 1664 * 476 = 792064 13) 7164 * 725 = 5193900 14) 9961 * 355 = 3536155 15) 5895 * 354 = 2086830 16) 2363 * 432 = 1020816 17) 3375 * 634 = 2139750 18) 5864 * 673 = 3946472 19) 9884 * 841 = 8312444 20) 5951 * 879 = 5230929 21) 9057 * 179 = 1621203 22) 8794 * 186 = 1635684 23) 9453 * 535 = 5057355 24) 4089 * 629 = 2571981 25) 2092 * 874 = 1828408 26) 2262 * 276 = 624312 27) 5808 * 489 = 2840112 28) 2015 * 410 = 826150 29) 9850 * 724 = 7131400 30) 4275 * 327 = 1397925 31) 6957 * 146 = 1015722 32) 4737 * 750 = 3552750 33) 8383 * 606 = 5080098 34) 7540 * 405 = 3053700 35) 8357 * 677 = 5657689 36) 2082 * 880 = 1832160 37) 7182 * 187 = 1343034 38) 4320 * 139 = 600480 39) 8256 * 280 = 2311680 40) 7567 * 979 = 7408093 41) 8461 * 790 = 6684190 42) 3712 * 208 = 772096 43) 8642 * 594 = 5133348 44) 2887 * 844 = 2436628 45) 6738 * 875 = 5895750 46) 7624 * 433 = 3301192 47) 6765 * 589 = 3984585 48) 3582 * 804 = 2879928 49) 3751 * 654 = 2453154 50) 5798 * 521 = 3020758

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 99

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 99

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets